EP2223569 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR ADJUSTING A COLOR LOCATION, AND ILLUMINATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Marcel-Breuer-Straße 6 80807 München / DE | [2020/44] |
Former [2013/16] | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/29] | For all designated states OSRAM AG Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/35] | For all designated states Osram Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSTER, Georg Demleitnerstr. 13 81371 München / DE | 02 /
SCHALLMOSER, Oskar Rathausstr. 14 85521 Ottobrunnn / DE | 03 /
BERTRAM, Ralph Am Nickelberg 1 93152 Nittendorf / DE | 04 /
MORGENBROD, Nico Wiesenstr. 3 98693 Martinroda / DE | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Brachmann, Roland W. Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze Patentanwälte in Partnerschaft Dietramszeller Str. 22 83624 Otterfing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Brachmann, Roland W. von Lieres Brachmann Schulze Patentanwälte Grillparzerstraße 12A D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08858320.8 | 05.12.2008 | [2010/35] | WO2008EP10344 | Priority number, date | DE20071059131 | 07.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007059131 | [2010/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009071315 | Date: | 11.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2223569 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08, H05B37/02 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
H05B45/22 (EP,KR,US);
H05B45/20 (KR);
H05B45/10 (KR);
H05B45/28 (EP,US);
H05B47/10 (KR);
H05B47/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR EINSTELLUNG EINES FARBORTS SOWIE LEUCHTSYSTEM | [2010/35] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR ADJUSTING A COLOR LOCATION, AND ILLUMINATION SYSTEM | [2010/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉGLAGE D'UNE LOCALISATION CHROMATIQUE, ET SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE CORRESPONDANT | [2010/35] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 01.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4341669 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [X]EP1462711 (OKUMURA YUKIYASU [JP]) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0020] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0040] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0050] * * figures 1,4,5,8,9 *; | [X]WO2006105649 (TIR SYSTEMS LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] * * paragraphs [0036] - [0041] * * paragraphs [0048] - [0054] * * paragraph [0060] * * figures 2-6b *; | [X]WO2006109237 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * page 4, line 9 - page 7, line 10 * * figures 1,4,5 *; | [X]DE102005022832 (ARNOLD & RICHTER KG [DE]) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0003] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0044] * * paragraphs [0115] - [0138] * * figures 14-16 * | by applicant | WO2006105649 | WO2006109237 |