EP2223484 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COMPENSATING DC OFFSETS IN COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2010/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'SHEA, Helena, Deirdre 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Reedy, Orlaith, et al Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Reedy, Orlaith, et al Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 08859190.4 | 11.12.2008 | [2010/35] | WO2008US86489 | Priority number, date | US20070955159 | 12.12.2007 Original published format: US 955159 | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009076563 | Date: | 18.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2223484 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/06 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
H04L25/063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KOMPENSIEREN VON GLEICHSTROMOFFSETS IN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN | [2010/35] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COMPENSATING DC OFFSETS IN COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS | [2010/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR COMPENSER DES DÉCALAGES DE CC DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE COMMUNICATION | [2010/35] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 20.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/40] | 17.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2004109516 (O'SHEA HELENA D [US]) [X] 1,11,17 * abstract paragraphs 4,5,6,12,16 claim 1 figure 1,3 * [Y] 2-10,12-16,18-25; | [A]WO2007057844 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,2,11,12,17,18 * abstract figure 3 *; | [A]WO2004047388 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract pages 5,6,7 * | [Y] - LINDOFF B, "Using a direct conversion receiver in edge terminals - a new DC offset compensation algorithm", THE 11TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, 2000. PIMRC 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20000918), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-6463-9, pages 959 - 963, XP010520777 [Y] 2-10,12-16,18-25 * abstract sections 1-5 * | Examination | US2005164639 |