EP2230953 - DEGRADABLE CIGARETTE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celanese Acetate LLC 1601 West LBJ Freeway Dallas, TX 75234 / US | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERTSON, Raymond, M. 3210 Gordon Drive Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | 02 /
THOMAS, William, C. 342 Horseshoe Farm Road Pembroke, VA 24136 / US | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Lahrtz, Fritz Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Mai, Dörr, Besier Patentanwälte Steuerberater/Wirtschaftsprüfer John-F.-Kennedy-Straße 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2010/39] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 08860857.5 | 03.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008US85294 | Priority number, date | US20070014210 | 17.12.2007 Original published format: US 14210 | US20080135264 | 09.06.2008 Original published format: US 135264 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009079202 | Date: | 25.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2230953 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A24D3/10, A24D3/16, A24D3/06, A24D3/14 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
A24D3/10 (EP,KR,US);
A24D3/02 (KR);
A24D3/061 (EP,US);
A24D3/068 (EP,US);
A24D3/14 (EP,US);
A24D3/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/39] | A24D3/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | ABBAUBARER ZIGARETTENFILTER | [2017/11] | English: | DEGRADABLE CIGARETTE FILTER | [2010/39] | French: | FILTRE À CIGARETTES DÉGRADABLE | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/39] | ABBAUBAREr ZIGARETTENFILTER | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 13.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 17.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9220738 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 1, line 3 - line 11 * * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 2 * * page 9, line 16 - line 24 *; | [XI]EP0597478 (DAICEL CHEM [JP]) [X] 1,19 * page 1, line 3 - line 4 * * page 1, line 56 - page 2, line 2 * * page 5, line 37 - line 53 * * page 6, line 31 - line 42 * * page 7, line 49 - page 8, line 33 * [I] 3,5,6,13,20; | [Y]JPH0731451 (DAICEL CHEM) [Y] 10-12,18 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0716117 (DAICEL CHEM [JP], et al) [A] 1-6,19,20* the whole document *; | [XYI]EP0987276 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,13,19,20 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0041] * [Y] 10-12,18 [I] 2,5-9,14-17; | [A]WO0168893 (FEED ENERGY COMPANY [US]) [A] 10-12,18 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5947126 (WILSON STEVEN A [US], et al); | [Y]US5478386 (ITOH MASANORI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5804296 (ITOH MASANORI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5495860 (TEUFEL EBERHARD [DE], et al); | [Y]JPH0937799 (OSAKA CITY, et al); | [Y]US6475758 (REANEY MARTIN J T [US]); | [Y]US5913311 (ITO KATSUTAKA [JP], et al); | [Y]US2002128184 (CHOKSHI DILIP [US]) | Examination | US3526904 | by applicant | EP0597478 | EP0987276 | US5491024 | US5647383 | US6571802 | US6739344 |