EP2232885 - 3D MODE SELECTION MECHANISM FOR VIDEO PLAYBACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEWTON, Philip, S. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
MOLL, Hendrik, F. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
STAN, Gheorghe, S. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
SCALORI, Francesco c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Kroeze, Johannes Antonius Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Kroeze, Johannes Antonius Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 08861113.2 | 10.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008IB55185 | Priority number, date | EP20070123190 | 14.12.2007 Original published format: EP 07123190 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009077929 | Date: | 25.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2232885 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
H04N13/139 (EP,BR,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,BR,US);
H04N13/144 (BR,US);
H04N13/189 (EP,BR,US);
H04N13/359 (EP,BR,US);
H04N13/366 (EP,BR,US);
G11B2020/10611 (EP,BR,US);
H04N2213/002 (EP,BR,US);
H04N2213/003 (EP,BR,US);
H04N2213/007 (EP,BR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | 3D-MODUS-AUSWAHLMECHANISMUS FÜR VIDEOWIEDERGABE | [2010/39] | English: | 3D MODE SELECTION MECHANISM FOR VIDEO PLAYBACK | [2010/39] | French: | MÉCANISME DE SÉLECTION DE MODE 3D POUR LECTURE VIDÉO | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 02.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/31] | 25.02.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/31] | 12.03.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.12.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 09.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0888018 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6-20 * column 6, line 15 - line 55; figures 4,5 * * column 7, line 43 - line 58 * * column 8, line 18 - line 36 * [Y] 2-5; | [X]US2004027267 (ROUSSO ARMAND M [US]) [X] 1,8* paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0023] *; | [Y]US2004057612 (TABATA SEIICHIRO [JP]) [Y] 2-5 * paragraph [0044] * | Examination | WO2004034398 | - BOLIO D D R J, "Integration of 3D video into the Blu-ray format", (20071001), pages I - IX,1, MASTER THESIS TECHNISCHE UNIVERSITEIT EINDHOVEN DEPARTMENT OF MATHEMATICS AND COMPUTER SCIENCE, TECHNISCHE UNIVERSITEIT EINDHOVEN, NL, URL: http://alexandria.tue.nl/extra1/afstversl/wsk-i/bolio2007.pdf, XP008148221 | by applicant | US2004228606 | US2008158250 |