EP2231390 - FIBER AGGREGATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 15.04.2016 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | 15.04.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARLSON, James G. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
BERRIGAN, Michael R. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
CRANDALL, Michael D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
KADOMA, Ignatius A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
WU, Yong K. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08862270.9 | 11.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008US86323 | Priority number, date | US20070013819P | 14.12.2007 Original published format: US 13819 P | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009079315 | Date: | 25.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2231390 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/02 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
D04H1/42 (EP,US);
C09K8/035 (EP,US);
C09K8/70 (EP,US);
C09K8/92 (EP,US);
C09K2208/08 (EP,US);
D01F8/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249924 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2933 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2967 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2969 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | FASERAGGREGAT | [2010/39] | English: | FIBER AGGREGATE | [2010/39] | French: | AGRÉGAT DE FIBRES | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 27.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/20] | 14.04.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.04.2016 | 19.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP16164922.3 / EP3059338 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5330005 (CARD ROGER J [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * column 2, line 29 - line 44 * * column 3, line 4 - line 35 * * column 4, line 7 - line 35; examples 15,27; claims 1-22 *; | [E]WO2009079310 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2010075248 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [E] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]US5017268 (CLITHEROW BARBARA M [GB], et al); | [A]US5641584 (ANDERSEN PER JUST [US], et al); | [A]US6444600 (BAEK YONG KEE [KR], et al) |