EP2225601 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO PROJECTION DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE Systems PLC 6 Carlton Gardens London SW1Y 5AD / GB | [2010/36] |
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states BAE Systems PLC 6 Carlton Gardens London, Greater London SW1Y 5AD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMMONDS, Michael, David BAE SYSTEMS Avionics Systems Design Solutions Airport Works Rochester Kent ME1 2XX / GB | 02 /
NOUI, Louahab BAE SYSTEMS Avionics Systems Design Solutions Airport Works Rochester Kent ME1 2XX / GB | [2010/36] | Representative(s) | McBrien, Matthew Nicholas BAE Systems plc Group Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 87 Warwick House Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [2010/36] | Application number, filing date | 08862289.9 | 11.11.2008 | [2010/36] | WO2008GB51051 | Priority number, date | GB20070024604 | 18.12.2007 Original published format: GB 0724604 | EP20070270076 | 18.12.2007 Original published format: EP 07270076 | [2010/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009077774 | Date: | 25.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2225601 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, F21V8/00, G02B5/18 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
G02B27/0103 (EP,US);
G02B27/0081 (EP,US);
G02B27/0172 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0125 (EP,US);
G02B2027/015 (EP,US);
G02B5/18 (EP,US);
G02B6/0016 (EP,US);
G02B6/0028 (EP,US);
G02B6/0038 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN AN ODER IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT PROJEKTIONSANZEIGEN | [2010/36] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO PROJECTION DISPLAYS | [2010/36] | French: | AMÉLIORATIONS APPORTÉES À OU LIÉES À DES PROJECTEURS | [2010/36] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 07.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/43] | 18.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2006132914 (WEISS VICTOR [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,9-14,17-21 * paragraphs [0077] - [0082] - [0095] - [0097] - [0140] - [0146] - [0194] - [0202] - [0216] , [0235] , [0281] - [0298] - [0301]; figures 10-14,23a-23c,24,28 * * paragraphs [0311] , [0329] - [0335] * * the whole document * [Y] 10-18,21; | [DY]WO2007029032 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB], et al) [DY] 10-18,21 * page 2, line 30 - page 4, line 2; figures 2,3 * * page 5, line 25 - line 30 * * page 6, line 13 - line 18 * * page 7, line 15 - line 20 * * page 8, line 24 - line 27 * * page 10, line 23 - line 25 *; | [A]US2006126179 (LEVOLA TAPANI [FI]) [A] 1,2,10-13,17-20 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0015] , [0098] , [0103] - [0106]; figures 1,3a,4 *; | [A]US2006018014 (NIV YEHUDA [IL], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0159] - paragraph [0163] * * paragraphs [0172] , [0176] , [0182] , [0185] * |