EP2231712 - METHOD OF PROCESSING BETA-GLUCAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valtion Teknillinen Tutkimuskeskus Vuorimiehentie 3 02150 Espoo / FI | For all designated states Glykos Finland Oy Viikinkaari 6 00790 Helsinki / FI | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUKOVIRTA-NORJA, Anu Kilonpuisto 2 D 74 FI-02610 Espoo / FI | 02 /
LEHTINEN, Pekka Lohansuonkuja 3 FI-02880 Veikkola / FI | 03 /
VIRKAJÄRVI, Ilkka Tuohimäki 3 B 6 FI-02130 Espoo / FI | 04 /
SUORTTI, Mikko Vanhan-Mankkaantie 4 C 2 FI-02180 Espoo / FI | 05 /
MYLLYMÄKI, Olavi Ilmakuja 4 A 11 FI-02210 Espoo / FI | 06 /
HELIN, Jari Valurintie 66 05200 Rajamäki / FI | 07 /
OLONEN, Anne Helkalantie 71 FI-15700 Lahti / FI | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2010/39] | Puranen, Maija-Liisa Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 08862722.9 | 18.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008FI50768 | Priority number, date | FI20070000993 | 19.12.2007 Original published format: FI 20070993 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009077659 | Date: | 25.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2231712 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 25.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/00, A23L1/10, A23L1/308, A23L2/52, A23L1/054 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
C08B37/0024 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (EP,US);
A23L33/22 (EP,US);
A23L7/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/39] | C08B37/00, A23L1/10, A23L1/308, A23L2/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON BETA-GLUCAN | [2010/39] | English: | METHOD OF PROCESSING BETA-GLUCAN | [2010/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DU BÊTA-GLUCANE | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 11.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 03.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2007146417 (BIOPOLYMER ENGINEERING INC DBA [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * page 12, line 7 - line 24 *; | [XA]US2006172392 (ZHOU SHUANG [US], et al) [X] 13-15 * example 16 * [A] 1-12 | International search | [A]WO2005120251 (GLUBIKAN AB OY [FI], et al); | [A]US2003147993 (HEDDLESON RONALD A [US], et al); | [A]WO9850398 (UNIV RUTGERS [US], et al); | [A]WO02076244 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al); | [AP]WO2008140744 (BIOPOLYMER ENGINEERING INC DBA [US], et al) | [A] - JOHANSSON, L. ET AL., "Hydrolysis of beta-glucan", FOOD CHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 97, no. 1, pages 71 - 79, XP025129973 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.foodchem.2005.03.031 | [X] - TOSH, S.M. ET AL., "Structural characteristics and reological properties of partially hydrolyced oat beta-glucan: the effects of molecular weight and hydrolysis method", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, (2004), vol. 55, pages 425 - 436, XP004491760 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbpol.2003.11.004 |