EP2226954 - AN OPTICAL ACCESS NETWORK DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, AND THE SYSTEM AND THE DEVICE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Ruobin Huawei Technologies Co, Ltd. Intellectual Property department B1-3A, Bantian Longgan District 518129 Shenzhen / CN | [2010/36] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/21] | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Dessauerstrasse 3 80992 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/36] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Riesstrasse 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08862723.7 | 02.12.2008 | [2010/36] | WO2008CN73294 | Priority number, date | CN2007132132 | 05.12.2007 Original published format: CN200710032132 | [2010/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009076845 | Date: | 25.06.2009 | Language: | ZH | [2009/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2226954 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/24 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
H04B10/25754 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN OPTISCHES ZUGANGSNETZ SOWIE SYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2010/36] | English: | AN OPTICAL ACCESS NETWORK DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, AND THE SYSTEM AND THE DEVICE THEREOF | [2010/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES D'UN RÉSEAU D'ACCÈS OPTIQUE, ET LE SYSTÈME ET DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT | [2010/36] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2010 | Translation filed | 31.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 05.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/23] | 28.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005025505 (SOTO ALEXANDER [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [I] 4,9-11; | [XI]WO2004054290 (LGC WIRELESS INC [US]) [X] 1,5,12 * abstract * * page 1, lines 9-11 * * page 6, line 4 - page 7, line 7 * * page 12, lines 23-27 * * page 19, line 26 - page 20, line 8 * * page 21, line 20 - page 23, line 3 * * page 25, line 5 - page 27, line 29 * * figures 3, 12, 14-16 * [I] 2-4,6-11,13; | [XI]US2003072055 (MICKELSSON HANS [SE], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [00 6] * * paragraphs [0019] - [0039] * * figures 1, 2, 3A, 3B * [I] 4,9-11; | [I]CN1988724 (BEIFANG FENGHUO SCIENCE AND TE [CN]) [I] 1-13 * figures 1-5 * | International search | [A]CN1360402 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]JP2006094446 (HITACHI INT ELECTRIC INC); | [A]CN1801673 (COMBA TELECOM TECH GUANGZHOU [CN]); | [X]CN200973095Y (JINXIN COMM SYSTEM GUANGZHOU C [CN]) |