EP2203834 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANAGING APPLICATION DATA IN A NFC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inside Secure 41 Parc Club du Golf 13856 Aix-en-Provence Cedex 3 / FR | [2011/24] |
Former [2010/27] | For all designated states Inside Contactless 41 Parc Club du Golf 13856 Aix-en-Provence Cedex 3 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARRAT, Bruno 2 Clos des Marronniers 405 Avenue des Siffleuses F-13090 Aix en Provence / FR | [2010/27] | Representative(s) | Marchand, André, et al Omnipat 610, chemin de Fabrègues 13510 Éguilles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Marchand, André, et al OMNIPAT, 24 Place des Martyrs de la Résistance 13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR | Application number, filing date | 08862749.2 | 29.09.2008 | [2010/27] | WO2008FR01351 | Priority number, date | FR20070006779 | 27.09.2007 Original published format: FR 0706779 | FR20070006778 | 27.09.2007 Original published format: FR 0706778 | [2010/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009077664 | Date: | 25.06.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2203834 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2203834 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/10 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
G06Q20/3278 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,KR,US);
H04B5/77 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/80 (EP,KR,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04M2250/04 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWALTUNG VON ANWENDUNGSDATEN IN EINEM NFC-SYSTEM | [2010/27] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANAGING APPLICATION DATA IN A NFC SYSTEM | [2010/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE DONNÉES D'APPLICATION DANS UN SYSTÈME NFC | [2010/27] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 27.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.03.2011 | CY | 09.03.2011 | CZ | 09.03.2011 | DK | 09.03.2011 | EE | 09.03.2011 | FI | 09.03.2011 | HR | 09.03.2011 | HU | 09.03.2011 | IE | 09.03.2011 | IT | 09.03.2011 | LT | 09.03.2011 | LV | 09.03.2011 | MT | 09.03.2011 | NL | 09.03.2011 | PL | 09.03.2011 | RO | 09.03.2011 | SE | 09.03.2011 | SI | 09.03.2011 | SK | 09.03.2011 | TR | 09.03.2011 | BG | 09.06.2011 | NO | 09.06.2011 | GR | 10.06.2011 | ES | 20.06.2011 | IS | 09.07.2011 | PT | 11.07.2011 | LU | 29.09.2011 | BE | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
MT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
TR | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
LU | 29.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
MT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
LU | 29.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
MT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 09.03.2011 | |
CY | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 09.03.2011 | |
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]AU718196B (APREX CORP) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1327222 (INSIDE TECHNOLOGIES [FR]) [AD] 1-19* the whole document *; | [A]US2005006469 (NONNEMAN ROBERT V [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]AU2006200187 (CORESTREET LTD) [A] 1-19 * page 14, line 23 - page 18, line 25 *; | [X]US2006136902 (MONROE ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,10,12-14,18,19 * figure 1A * * figure 1C * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0036] * |