EP2231875 - CONTAMINATION-FREE REAGENTS FOR NUCLEIC ACID AMPLIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NELSON, John 3 Tracy Court Clifton Park New York 12065 / US | 02 /
DUTHIE, Scott 2073 Skyline Drive Schenectady New York 12306 / US | 03 /
GROSSMAN, Greg 3 Hamstread Court Halfmoon New York 12065 / US | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Bryan, Ian Bennett, et al GE Healthcare Limited Pollards Wood Nightingales Lane Chalfont St Giles, Buckinghamshire HP8 4SP / GB | [2014/10] |
Former [2010/39] | Hesslewood, Ian Philip GE Healthcare UK Limited Pollards Wood Nightingales Lane Chalfont St Giles Buckinghamshire HP8 4SP / GB | Application number, filing date | 08863361.5 | 10.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008EP67259 | Priority number, date | US20070957534 | 17.12.2007 Original published format: US 957534 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009077411 | Date: | 25.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2231875 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2231875 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6848 (EP,US);
C12N9/1241 (US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6848, C12Q2525/125, C12Q2521/319 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | KONTAMINATIONSFREIE REAGENTIEN ZUR NUKLEINSÄUREAMPLIFIKATION | [2010/39] | English: | CONTAMINATION-FREE REAGENTS FOR NUCLEIC ACID AMPLIFICATION | [2010/39] | French: | RÉACTIFS EXEMPTS DE CONTAMINATION POUR L'AMPLIFICATION D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 17.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 13.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.12.2008 | AT | 12.03.2014 | BE | 12.03.2014 | CY | 12.03.2014 | CZ | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | ES | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | HR | 12.03.2014 | LT | 12.03.2014 | LV | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | MT | 12.03.2014 | NL | 12.03.2014 | PL | 12.03.2014 | RO | 12.03.2014 | SE | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | SK | 12.03.2014 | TR | 12.03.2014 | BG | 12.06.2014 | NO | 12.06.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | IS | 12.07.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | IE | 10.12.2014 | LU | 10.12.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 10.12.2008 | |
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
TR | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 10.12.2014 | ||
LU | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 10.12.2014 | ||
LU | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 10.12.2014 | ||
LU | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 10.12.2014 | ||
LU | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.03.2014 | |
NO | 12.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0585660 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [Y] 1-6,15-21,23,25 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2002172972 (TABOR STANLEY [US], et al) [X] 7-14 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6,15-21,23,25; | [A]WO03070986 (BIOMOLECULAR RES SOLUTIONS PTY [AU], et al) [A] 7-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03087402 (INFECTIO DIAGNOSTIC INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2004020604 (AMERSHAM BIOSCIENCES CORP [US]) [X] 22,24 * claims 13,14 *; | [X]US2004248105 (KUMAR GYANENDRA [US]) [X] 22,24 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007105965 (WAIKATOLINK LTD [NZ], et al) [A] 1-25* the whole document *; | [X] - ZHU Y S ET AL, "The use of exonuclease III for polymerase chain reaction sterilization.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH 11 MAY 1991, (19910511), vol. 19, no. 9, ISSN 0305-1048, page 2511, XP002518787 [X] 7,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/19.9.2511 | [A] - MEIER ALBRECHT ET AL, "Elimination of contaminating DNA within polymerase chain reaction reagents: Implications for a general approach to detection of uncultured pathogens", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 31, no. 3, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 646 - 652, XP002518788 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | [A] - CORLESS C E ET AL, "Contamination and sensitivity issues with a real-time universal 16S rRNA PCR.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY MAY 2000, (200005), vol. 38, no. 5, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 1747 - 1752, XP002518789 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | [A] - HUGHES M S ET AL, "Identification and elimination of DNA sequences in Taq DNA polymerase.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY AUG 1994, (199408), vol. 32, no. 8, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 2007 - 2008, XP002518790 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | [A] - GOTO M ET AL, "Contamination of diverse nifH and nifH-like DNA into commercial PCR primers", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY LETTERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20050501), vol. 246, no. 1, ISSN 0378-1097, pages 33 - 38, XP004876187 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.femsle.2005.03.042 |