EP2223557 - METHODS AND ARRANGEMENTS IN A MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/01] |
Former [2010/35] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SÅGFORS, Mats Jungfrusvängen 33 G 12 FI-02400 Kyrkslätt / FI | 02 /
LINDSTRÖM, Magnus Mjölnarstigen 41 S-163 41 Spånga / SE | 03 /
PEISA, Janne Koivunlehväkuja 3 FI-02130 Espoo / FI | 04 /
TORSNER, Johan Skogstorpsvägen 2 C9 FI-02430 Masaby / FI | 05 /
WAGER, Stefan Gårdsgränden 8 H FI-02360 Espoo / FI | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2017/01] |
Former [2010/35] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 08864910.8 | 10.11.2008 | [2010/35] | WO2008SE51283 | Priority number, date | US20070016057 | 21.12.2007 Original published format: US 16057 | US20080020868 | 14.01.2008 Original published format: US 20868 | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009082333 | Date: | 02.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2223557 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2223557 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/18, H04L5/00, // H04W8/26 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
H04W28/18 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0053 (US);
H04W8/26 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/35] | H04W28/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2010/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNGEN IN EINEM MOBILEN TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2010/35] | English: | METHODS AND ARRANGEMENTS IN A MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2010/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET AGENCEMENTS DANS UN RÉSEAU DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATIONS MOBILES | [2010/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 24.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13188808.3 / EP2696637 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.11.2008 | AT | 04.01.2017 | CY | 04.01.2017 | CZ | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | FI | 04.01.2017 | HR | 04.01.2017 | LT | 04.01.2017 | LV | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | RO | 04.01.2017 | SE | 04.01.2017 | SI | 04.01.2017 | SK | 04.01.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | NO | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | IS | 04.05.2017 | PT | 04.05.2017 | [2019/46] |
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.11.2008 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006062182 (TERRY STEPHEN E [US]) [X] 1,4-10,13-20,23-28,31-36 * paragraphs [0014] , [0027] - [0036] *; | [X]EP1655909 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4-11,13-21,23-29,31-36 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0011] , [0013] - [0020] - [0024] - [0044] - [0078] - [0112] *; | [XA]US2006203772 (LAROIA RAJIV [US], et al) [X] 1,4-8,10,13-17,19,20,23-26,28,31-34,36 * paragraphs [0005] - [0016] - [0081] - [0084] - [0103] - [0113] *[A] 3,12,22,30 | Examination | US60957450 | WO2009025525 |