EP2234169 - PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZAKI, Ryo c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
TSUNEMI, Akiko c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 03 /
YAMAZAKI, Tsutomu c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 04 /
OKAMOTO, Satoshi c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/39] | 01 /
OZAKI, Ryo c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
02 /
TZUNEMI, Akiko c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMAZAKI, Tsutomu c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | |||
04 /
OKAMOTO, Satoshi c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08865004.9 | 27.11.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008JP71521 | Priority number, date | JP20070332429 | 25.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007332429 | [2010/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009081684 | Date: | 02.07.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2234169 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/04 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
H01L31/022433 (EP,US);
H01L31/022425 (US);
H01L31/02245 (EP,US);
H01L31/035281 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | FOTOELEKTRISCHE WANDLERANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PHOTOELEKTRISCHEN WANDLERANORDNUNG | [2010/39] | English: | PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION DEVICE | [2010/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION PHOTOÉLECTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION PHOTOÉLECTRIQUE | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2010 | Translation filed | 19.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 12.08.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS63211773 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPS615584 (UNISEARCH LTD); | [A]JPS58201377 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPH0251282 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2007521668 (ADVENT SOLAR, INC.); | [A]WO2007099955 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al); | [A] - GRANEK F. ET AL., "A SYSTEMATIC APPROACH TO REDUCE PROCESS-INDUCED SHUNTS IN BACK-CONTACTED MC-SI SOLAR CELLS", IEEE 4th World Conference on Photovoltaic Energy Conversion, (2006), pages 1319 - 1322, XP031007558 | by applicant | JP2002176186 | JPH08191152 | JP2005353691 | - FILIP GRANEK ET AL., "A SYSTEMATIC APPROACH TO REDUCE PROCESS-INDUCED SHUNTS IN BACK-CONTACTED MC-SI SOLAR CELLS", IEEE 4TH WORLD CONFERENCE ON PHOTOVOLTAIC ENERGY CONVERSION, (2006), pages 1319 - 1322, XP031007558 | - FILIP GRANEK ET AL., IEEE 4TH WORLD CONFERENCE ON PHOTOVOLTAIC ENERGY CONVERSION, (2006), pages 1319 - 1322 |