EP2225206 - AMINOBENZAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS USEFUL AGENTS FOR CONTROLLING ANIMAL PARASITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Animal Health GmbH Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 10 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2019/35] |
Former [2018/42] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience Aktiengesellschaft Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÖRGENS, Ulrich Fester Str. 37 40882 Ratingen / DE | 02 /
YANAGI, Akihiko 2-40-11 Higashijonan Oyama-shi, Tochigi 323-0829 / JP | 03 /
WADA, Katsuaki 5-12-15 Nakakuki Oyama-shi, Tochigi 323-0806 / JP | 04 /
MURATA, Tetsuya 7-16-24-202 Joto Oyama-shi, Tochigi 323-0807 / JP | 05 /
WATANABE, Yukiyoshi 1-6-2-402 Joto Oyama-shi, Tochigi, 323-0807 / JP | 06 /
MIHARA, Jun 2-11-1-603 Ekihigashidouri Oyama-shi, Tochigi 323-0022 / JP | 07 /
ARAKI, Koichi 2-4-39 Kamiya Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-1216 / JP | [2019/09] |
Former [2010/44] | 01 /
GÖRGENS, Ulrich Fester Str. 37 40882 Ratingen / DE | ||
02 /
YANAGI, Akihiko 2-40-11 Higashijonan Oyama-shi Tochigi 323-0829 / JP | |||
03 /
WADA, Katsuaki 5-12-15 Nakakuki Oyama-shi Tochigi 323-0806 / JP | |||
04 /
MURATA, Tetsuya 7-16-24-202 Joto Oyama-shi Tochigi 323-0807 / JP | |||
05 /
WATANABE, Yukiyoshi 1-6-2-402 Joto, Oyama-shi Tochigi, 323-0807 / JP | |||
06 /
MIHARA, Jun 2-11-1-603 Ekihigashidouri Oyama-shi Tochigi 323-0022 / JP | |||
07 /
ARAKI, Koichi 2-4-39 Kamiya Ushiku-shi Ibaraki 300-1216 / JP | |||
Former [2010/36] | 01 /
GÖRGENS, Ulrich Fester Str. 37 40882 Ratingen / DE | ||
02 /
YANAGI, Akihiko 2-40-11 Higashijonan Oyama-shi Tochigi 323-0829 / JP | |||
03 /
WADA, Katsuaki 5-12-15 Nakakuki Oyama-shi Tochigi 323-0806 / JP | |||
04 /
MURATA, Tetsuya 7-16-24-202 Joto Oyama-shi Tochigi 323-0807 / JP | |||
05 /
WATANABE, Yukiyoshi 10-8 Takanawa 4-chome Tokyo 108 / JP | |||
06 /
MIHARA, Jun 2-11-1-603 Ekihigashidouri Oyama-shi Tochigi 323-0022 / JP | |||
07 /
ARAKI, Koichi 2-4-39 Kamiya Ushiku-shi Ibaraki 300-1216 / JP | Representative(s) | Tier 1 Patents C/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Bldg. 4685 Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 08865336.5 | 09.12.2008 | [2010/36] | WO2008EP10418 | Priority number, date | EP20070150343 | 21.12.2007 Original published format: EP 07150343 | [2010/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009080203 | Date: | 02.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2225206 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2225206 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/60, C07C237/42, A01N37/22, A01N43/40 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
C07D213/60 (EP,KR,US);
C07C237/42 (EP,KR,US);
A01N37/46 (EP,US);
A01N43/08 (EP,US);
A01N43/10 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
A01N43/82 (EP,US);
A01N47/20 (EP,US);
A61K31/495 (KR);
A61K31/53 (KR);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P33/10 (EP);
A61P33/12 (EP);
A61P33/14 (EP);
C07C271/28 (EP,US);
C07C317/44 (EP,US);
C07C323/62 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/09] |
Former [2010/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AMINOBENZAMIDDERIVATE ALS NÜTZLICHE WIRKSTOFFE ZUR PARASITENKONTROLLE BEI TIEREN | [2010/36] | English: | AMINOBENZAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS USEFUL AGENTS FOR CONTROLLING ANIMAL PARASITES | [2010/36] | French: | DÉRIVÉS D'AMINOBENZAMIDE EN TANT QU'AGENTS UTILES POUR CONTRÔLER LES PARASITES D'ANIMAUX | [2010/36] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 03.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.02.2019 | EE | 27.02.2019 | MC | 27.02.2019 | MT | 27.02.2019 | IS | 27.06.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 27.02.2019 | |
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | EE | 27.02.2019 | |
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | EE | 27.02.2019 | |
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | IS | 27.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3309367 (RUDOLF HIRT) [A] 1,9 * page 1, column 2, line 43 - line 56; claim 1 *; | [A]US6794392 (SUZUKI TSUNEJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [D]WO2005021488 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al); | [X]EP1661886 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [X] 1,3-6,9 * page 143, lines 15 to 18, 49 to 51 *; | [X]CA2616749 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9 * page 188, line 9; page 200, lines 8-10; page 203, lines 5-10; claims *; | [D]WO2007013150 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al); | [XD]WO2007013332 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al) [XD] 1,3-7,9 * abstract *; | [DX]WO2007017075 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [DX] 1,2,4-6,9 * page 21; claim 1 *; | [PXD]EP1938685 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [PXD] 1,3-7,9 |