EP2227712 - SYNTHETIC INTEGRAL IMAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolling Optics Ab Solna Strandväg 3, 1 tr 171 54 Solna / SE | [2013/02] |
Former [2010/37] | For all designated states Rolling Optics Ab Mäster Samuelsgatan 42, 8tr 111 57 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUNDVALL, Axel Greta Garbos väg 21 C S-SE-169 40 Solna / SE | [2010/37] | Representative(s) | Stenborg, Anders Vilhelm, et al Aros Patent AB P.O. Box 1544 751 45 Uppsala / SE | [2010/37] | Application number, filing date | 08865981.8 | 19.12.2008 | [2010/37] | WO2008SE51527 | Priority number, date | SE20070002906 | 27.12.2007 Original published format: SE 0702906 | [2010/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009085003 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2227712 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/22, B32B3/12, G06K19/16, G09F3/02 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
G02B27/60 (EP,US);
G02B30/27 (US);
G02B3/0056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/37] | Title | German: | SYNTHETISCHE EINTEILIGE BILDVORRICHTUNG | [2010/37] | English: | SYNTHETIC INTEGRAL IMAGE DEVICE | [2010/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FOURNITURE D'IMAGE INTÉGRALE SYNTHÉTIQUE | [2010/37] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 22.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/05] | 12.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6500526 (HANNINGTON MICHAEL [US]) [I] 1-15 * columns 1-8; figures 1-7 *; | [I]EP0997750 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]) [I] 1-15 * figure 5 *; | [A]US2006232859 (EBINA KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0118] - [0135]; figures 2-5 *; | [A]US5207852 (LIGHTLE VERA L [US], et al) [A] 2 * column 3, lines 25-30 *; | [A]US6369949 (CONLEY KENNETH E [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0004] * | International search | [X]WO2007115244 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]); | [X]US1918705 (IVES HERBERT E); | [Y]US2007058260 (STEENBLIK RICHARD A [US], et al); | [X]WO03061983 (NANOVENTIONS INC [US], et al); | [X]JPH07281327 (CANON KK); | [X]US2003017307 (ORLANDI RAUL MARIA [IT]); | [X]US4082426 (BROWN ROBERT A); | [Y]WO9427254 (DE LA RUE HOLOGRAPHICS LTD [GB], et al) |