EP2226658 - OPTICAL FILM AND OPTICAL SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adeka Corporation 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116-8554 / JP | [2010/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOTA, Akiko c/o ADEKA CORPORATION 2-13, Shirahata 5-chome Minami-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 336-0022 / JP | 02 /
KAMIMOTO, Tetsuo c/o ADEKA CORPORATION 2-13, Shirahata 5-chome Minami-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 336-0022 / JP | 03 /
FUKUSHIMA, Mitsuru c/o ADEKA CORPORATION 2-13, Shirahata 5-chome Minami-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 336-0022 / JP | [2017/34] |
Former [2010/36] | 01 /
YOKOTA, Akiko c/o ADEKA CORPORATION 2-13, Shirahata 5-chome Minami-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 336-0022 / JP | ||
02 /
KAMIMOTO, Tetsuo c/o ADEKA CORPORATION 2-13, Shirahata 5-chome Minami-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 336-0022 / JP | |||
03 /
FUKUSHIMA, Mitsuru c/o ADEKA CORPORATION 2-13, Shirahata 5-chome Minami-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 336-0022 / JP | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/34] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/36] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08866466.9 | 16.12.2008 | [2010/36] | WO2008JP72850 | Priority number, date | JP20070338161 | 27.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007338161 | JP20080318772 | 15.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008318772 | [2010/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009084426 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2226658 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2226658 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, C08K5/3492, G02F1/1335, G02B1/04 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
C08K5/3492 (EP,US);
G02B1/04 (EP,US);
C09K2323/031 (EP,US);
G02B5/3025 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
G02B1/04, C08L23/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/36] | G02B5/30, C08K5/3492, G02F1/1335 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/34] |
Former [2010/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OPTISCHER FILM UND OPTISCHE FOLIE | [2010/36] | English: | OPTICAL FILM AND OPTICAL SHEET | [2010/36] | French: | FILM OPTIQUE ET FEUILLE OPTIQUE | [2010/36] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2010 | Translation filed | 04.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 07.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2008 | AT | 23.08.2017 | CY | 23.08.2017 | CZ | 23.08.2017 | DK | 23.08.2017 | EE | 23.08.2017 | ES | 23.08.2017 | FI | 23.08.2017 | HR | 23.08.2017 | IT | 23.08.2017 | LT | 23.08.2017 | LV | 23.08.2017 | MC | 23.08.2017 | PT | 23.08.2017 | RO | 23.08.2017 | SE | 23.08.2017 | SI | 23.08.2017 | SK | 23.08.2017 | TR | 23.08.2017 | BG | 23.11.2017 | NO | 23.11.2017 | GR | 24.11.2017 | GB | 16.12.2017 | IE | 16.12.2017 | LU | 16.12.2017 | MT | 16.12.2017 | IS | 23.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 16.12.2008 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CY | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
GB | 16.12.2017 | ||
IE | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
MT | 16.12.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 16.12.2008 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CY | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
GB | 16.12.2017 | ||
IE | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
MT | 16.12.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.12.2008 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
GB | 16.12.2017 | ||
IE | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
MT | 16.12.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
GB | 16.12.2017 | ||
IE | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
MT | 16.12.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
GB | 16.12.2017 | ||
IE | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
MT | 16.12.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
GB | 16.12.2017 | ||
IE | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
MT | 16.12.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IE | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
MT | 16.12.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.12.2017 | ||
MT | 16.12.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 23.08.2017 | |
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 23.08.2017 | |
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 23.08.2017 | |
NO | 23.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1746445 (ADEKA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraphs [0023] , [0030] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0054] *; | [A]WO2007111387 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 27, line 1 - page 28, line 3 * * page 51, line 26 - page 55, line 15 *; | [A]US2001003363 (MARIEN AUGUST [BE], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0022] * | International search | [X]WO2005109052 (ASAHI DENKA CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2003084269 | JP2002047357 | JP2007108775 | JP2007017555 |