EP2231330 - PHOSPHONITE CONTAINING CATALYSTS FOR HYDROFORMYLATION PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Chemical Company 200 South Wilcox Drive Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Yun-Shan 709 Driver Court College Station, TX 77845 / US | 02 /
RODGERS, Jody, Lee c/o Eastman Chemical Company 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660-5075 / US | [2010/43] |
Former [2010/39] | 01 /
LIU, Yun-Shan 709 Driver Court College Station, TX 77845 / US | ||
02 /
RODGERS, Jody, Lee 908 Kenwood Lane Longview, TX 75604 / US | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08867478.3 | 17.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008US13774 | Priority number, date | US20070016665P | 26.12.2007 Original published format: US 16665 P | US20080330038 | 08.12.2008 Original published format: US 330038 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009085161 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2231330 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/18 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
B01J31/1865 (EP,US);
B01J2231/321 (EP,US);
B01J2531/822 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | PHOSPHONITHALTIGE KATALYSATOREN FÜR HYDROFORMYLIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2010/39] | English: | PHOSPHONITE CONTAINING CATALYSTS FOR HYDROFORMYLATION PROCESSES | [2010/39] | French: | CATALYSEURS CONTENANT UN PHOSPHONITE POUR PROCÉDÉS D'HYDROFORMYLATION | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 02.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 09.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5712403 (SATO KEIICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,8 * column 19, line 1 * * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 13 * * column 36, line 44 - line 62 * [A] ; | [X]US6265620 (URATA HISAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * examples 7,8; compounds 39, 51, 52 *; | [PX]WO2008088495 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [PX] 1-3,5-11 * claims 6,16 * |