EP2234475 - LOW SATURATED-FAT SUNFLOWER AND ASSOCIATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Agrosciences LLC Washington Street 1790 Building Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2010/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERDES, James, Todd 1024 Main Street Breckenridge MN 56520 / US | 02 /
KAHL, Charles, James 16550 Wanatah Trail Westfield IN 46074 / US | 03 /
ERICKSON, Angela, Lee 25935 175th Avenue Fergus Falls MN 56537 / US | 04 /
BENSON, Robert, Martin N5936 County Road O Ellsworth WI 54011 / US | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Shah, Punita, et al HGF Limited 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Shah, Punita, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2012/40] | Ward, Siobhan, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | ||
Former [2010/40] | Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 08867547.5 | 19.12.2008 | [2010/40] | WO2008US87827 | Priority number, date | US20070015591P | 20.12.2007 Original published format: US 15591 P | [2010/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009086196 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2234475 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01H5/10 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
A01H5/10 (EP,RU,US);
A01H6/1464 (EP,RU,US);
A01H1/02 (EP,RU,US);
A23D7/04 (RU,US);
A23L33/12 (RU,US);
C12N15/82 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/40] | Title | German: | SONNENBLUME MIT NIEDRIGEM GEHALT AN GESÄTTIGTEN FETTEN UND DAMIT ZUSAMMENHÄNGENDE VERFAHREN | [2010/40] | English: | LOW SATURATED-FAT SUNFLOWER AND ASSOCIATED METHODS | [2010/40] | French: | TOURNESOL À FAIBLE TENEUR FAIBLE EN GRAISSES SATURÉES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2010/40] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 15.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/53] | 23.11.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.11.2015 | 24.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP12196370.6 / EP2586293 | EP18177991.9 / EP3427574 | EP22193565.3 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.08.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0496504 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]); | [A]US6175065 (SCHMIDT HERBERT J [US], et al); | [A]US6229056 (ANSMANN ACHIM [DE], et al); | [A]WO2007107807 (AVESTHA GENGRAINE TECH PVT LTD [IN], et al); |