EP2205693 - DICING DIE BONDING FILM HAVING EXCELLENT BURR PROPERTY AND RELIABILITY AND SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT, NL, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2010/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOO, Hyun Jee 1002-1902 Hanhwa Kume Green 3-cha Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-509 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jang Soon 204-1002 BanseokMaeul Apt. 2 Danji Jijok-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-772 / KR | 03 /
HONG, Jong Wan 7-105 LG Chem Researcher Apt. Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Hyo Soon 303-203 Songgang Green Apt. Songgang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-751 / KR | 05 /
KHO, Dong Han 204 Neul Purn Ville 338-37 Daemyeong 9-dong Nam-gu Daegu 705-803 / KR | [2015/22] |
Former [2010/28] | 01 /
YOO, Hyun Jee 1002-1902 Hanhwa Kume Green 3-cha Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-509 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Jang Soon 204-1002 BanseokMaeul Apt. 2 Danji Jijok-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-772 / KR | |||
03 /
HONG, Jong Wan 7-105 LG Chem Researcher Apt. Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | |||
04 /
PARK, Hyo Soon 303-203 Songgang Green Apt. Songgang-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-751 / KR | |||
05 /
KHO, Dong Han 204 Neul Purn Ville 338-37 Daemyeong 9-dong Nam-gu Daegu 705-803 / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2010/28] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08867582.2 | 28.10.2008 | [2010/28] | WO2008KR06348 | Priority number, date | KR20070139051 | 27.12.2007 Original published format: KR 20070139051 | [2010/28] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009084804 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2205693 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2205693 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C09J163/00, H01L21/58, H01L21/68 | [2014/08] | CPC: |
C09J163/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08G59/621 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (US);
C08K5/0025 (US);
C08K5/13 (US);
C08K5/3445 (US);
C09J133/068 (US);
H01L21/50 (KR);
H01L21/6836 (EP,US);
H01L24/27 (EP,US);
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
C09J2203/326 (US);
C09J2301/208 (US);
C09J2301/302 (US);
C09J2301/408 (US);
C09J7/35 (EP,US);
C09J7/385 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68327 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68336 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68377 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68381 (EP,US);
H01L2224/27003 (EP,US);
H01L2224/27436 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2919 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2929 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29387 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83191 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83862 (EP,US);
H01L2224/94 (EP,US);
H01L24/32 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/85 (EP,US);
H01L24/94 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0615 (EP,US);
H01L2924/351 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3511 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/27436, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2919, H01L2924/06 (US,EP);
H01L2224/2919, H01L2924/0615 (US,EP);
H01L2224/2919, H01L2924/0635 (US,EP);
H01L2224/2919, H01L2924/0665 (US,EP);
H01L2224/2929, H01L2924/06 (US,EP);
H01L2224/2929, H01L2924/0615 (US,EP);
H01L2224/2929, H01L2924/0635 (US,EP);
H01L2224/2929, H01L2924/0665 (US,EP);
H01L2224/94, H01L2224/27 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2010/28] | C09J163/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/22] |
Former [2010/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DICING-HAFTFOLIE MIT AUSGEZEICHNETER GRATMINIMIERUNG UND BETRIEBSSICHERHEIT SOWIE DAVON GEBRAUCH MACHENDE HALBLEITERVORRICHTUNG | [2010/28] | English: | DICING DIE BONDING FILM HAVING EXCELLENT BURR PROPERTY AND RELIABILITY AND SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE USING THE SAME | [2010/28] | French: | FILM QUADRILLÉ DE FIXAGE DES PUCES PRÉSENTANT D'EXCELLENTES PROPRIÉTÉS ANTI-BAVURE ET DE FIABILITÉ, ET DISPOSITIF À SEMICONDUCTEURS UTILISANT CE FILM | [2010/28] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 31.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.10.2008 | AT | 27.05.2015 | BE | 27.05.2015 | CY | 27.05.2015 | CZ | 27.05.2015 | DK | 27.05.2015 | EE | 27.05.2015 | ES | 27.05.2015 | FI | 27.05.2015 | HR | 27.05.2015 | IT | 27.05.2015 | LT | 27.05.2015 | LV | 27.05.2015 | MC | 27.05.2015 | MT | 27.05.2015 | NL | 27.05.2015 | PL | 27.05.2015 | RO | 27.05.2015 | SE | 27.05.2015 | SI | 27.05.2015 | SK | 27.05.2015 | TR | 27.05.2015 | BG | 27.08.2015 | NO | 27.08.2015 | GR | 28.08.2015 | IS | 27.09.2015 | PT | 28.09.2015 | IE | 28.10.2015 | LU | 28.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/45] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 28.10.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 27.05.2015 | |
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JP2003206457 (LINTEC CORP); | [A]JP2004134689 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [A]JP2005268434 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [A]JP2006161038 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [A]KR20060113372 (LS CABLE LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20060126364 (LS CABLE LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2007035852 (NITTO DENKO CORP) |