EP2231717 - NANO-LINKED METALLOCENE CATALYST COMPOSITIONS AND THEIR POLYMER PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, MT, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LP 10001 Six Pines Drive The Woodlands, TX 77380 / US | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURRAY, Rex E. 1206 Prairie Heights Drive Bartlesville Oklahoma 74006 / US | 02 /
MARTIN, Joel L. 636 SE Kenwood Drive Bartlesville Oklahoma 74006 / US | 03 /
JAYARATNE, Kumudini C. Kromme Riet 1 NL-9746 PV Groningen / NL | 04 /
YANG, Qing 2917 Montrose Drive Bartlesville Oklahoma 74006 / US | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2010/39] | Simpson, Mark Geoffrey, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08867620.0 | 15.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008US13705 | Priority number, date | US20070965982 | 28.12.2007 Original published format: US 965982 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009085129 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2231717 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2231717 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/6592, C08F210/16, C08F110/02, C08F4/659, C07F17/00 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
C07F17/00 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F2410/03 (EP,US);
C08F2410/07 (EP);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/65927 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2010/39] | C08F4/6592, C08F10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/43] |
Former [2010/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NANOVERKNÜPFTE METALLOCENE ENTHALTENDE KATALYSATORZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND IHRE POLYMERPRODUKTE | [2010/39] | English: | NANO-LINKED METALLOCENE CATALYST COMPOSITIONS AND THEIR POLYMER PRODUCTS | [2010/39] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE CATALYSEUR DE MÉTALLOCÈNE À NANO-LIAISON ET LEURS PRODUITS POLYMÈRES | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 10.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2008 | AT | 21.10.2015 | BG | 21.10.2015 | CY | 21.10.2015 | CZ | 21.10.2015 | DK | 21.10.2015 | EE | 21.10.2015 | ES | 21.10.2015 | FI | 21.10.2015 | HR | 21.10.2015 | IT | 21.10.2015 | LT | 21.10.2015 | LV | 21.10.2015 | MC | 21.10.2015 | MT | 21.10.2015 | NL | 21.10.2015 | PL | 21.10.2015 | RO | 21.10.2015 | SE | 21.10.2015 | SI | 21.10.2015 | SK | 21.10.2015 | TR | 21.10.2015 | IE | 15.12.2015 | LU | 15.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | NO | 21.01.2016 | GR | 22.01.2016 | IS | 21.02.2016 | PT | 22.02.2016 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/49] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03027131 (UNIVATION TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1-29* the whole document *; | [DX] - CANO SIERRA JESUS ET AL, Formation of dinuclear titanium and zirconium complexes by olefin metathesis--catalytic preparation of organometallic catalyst systems., CHEMISTRY (WEINHEIM AN DER BERGSTRASSE, GERMANY) 4 AUG 2003, VOL. 9, NR. 15, PAGE(S) 3618 - 3622, (20030804), ISSN 0947-6539, XP002516269 [DX] 1-5,7-11,13-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/CHEM.200304789 | [A] - KUWABARA J ET AL, "ZR/ZR AND ZR/FE DINUCLEAR COMPLEXES WITH FLEXIBLE BRIDGING LIGANDS. PREPARATION BY OLEFIN METATHESIS REACTION OF THE MONONUCLEAR PRECURSORS AND PROPERTIES AS POLYMERIZATION CATALYSTS", ORGANOMETALLICS, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20050523), vol. 24, no. 11, ISSN 0276-7333, pages 2705 - 2712, XP001228744 [A] 1-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om0500321 |