EP2224847 - MEASUREMENT OF PATIENT PHYSIOLOGICAL PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CVRX, Inc. 9201 West Broadway Avenue, Suite 650 Minneapolis, MN 55445 / US | [2010/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Russell, Eugene c/o CVRx Inc. 9201 West Broadway Avenue Suite 650 Minneapolis, MN 55445 / US | 02 /
STROEBEL, John, Charles c/o CVRx Inc. 9201 West Broadway Avenue Suite 650 Minneapolis, MN 55445 / US | 03 /
CHECK, Steve c/o CVRx Inc. 9201 West Broadway Avenue Suite 650 Minneapolis, MN 55445 / US | 04 /
YARED, Nadim c/o CVRx, Inc. 9201 West Broadway Avenue, Suite 650 Minneapolis, MN 55445 / US | 05 /
KIEVAL, Robert S. c/o CVRx, Inc. 9201 West Broadway Avenue, Suite 650 Minneapolis, MN 55445 / US | 06 /
LOVETT, Eric c/o CVRx, Inc. 9201 West Broadway Avenue, Suite 650 Minneapolis, MN 55445 / US | [2012/12] |
Former [2010/36] | 01 /
ANDERSON, Russell, Eugene c/o CVRx Inc. 9201 West Broadway Avenue Suite 650 Minneapolis, MN 55445 / US | ||
02 /
STROEBEL, John, Charles c/o CVRx Inc. 9201 West Broadway Avenue Suite 650 Minneapolis, MN 55445 / US | |||
03 /
CHECK, Steve c/o CVRx Inc. 9201 West Broadway Avenue Suite 650 Minneapolis, MN 55445 / US | Representative(s) | Neobard, William John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | Neobard, William John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08868910.4 | 29.12.2008 | [2010/36] | WO2008US88488 | Priority number, date | US20070018188P | 31.12.2007 Original published format: US 18188 P | US20070017496P | 28.12.2007 Original published format: US 17496 P | [2010/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009086536 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2224847 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0295, A61B5/042 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
A61B5/02007 (EP,US);
A61B5/0215 (EP,US);
A61B5/053 (EP,US);
A61B5/0538 (US);
A61B5/4035 (EP,US);
A61B5/6862 (EP,US);
A61B5/6876 (EP,US);
A61N1/36139 (US);
A61B5/024 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | MESSUNG DER PHYSIOLOGISCHEN PARAMETER EINES PATIENTEN | [2010/36] | English: | MEASUREMENT OF PATIENT PHYSIOLOGICAL PARAMETERS | [2010/36] | French: | MESURE DE PARAMÈTRES PHYSIOLOGIQUES D'UN PATIENT | [2010/36] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 15.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 27.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005149128 (HEIL RONALD W JR [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,11 * figures 8-11,16,17 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraphs [0057] , [0059] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0107] * [I] 5,9,10,12,13; | [XI]US2006094967 (BENNETT TOMMY D [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,11 * figures 2-3 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0042] * [I] 5,9,10,12,13; | [XI]WO2007136851 (CVRX INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,11 * figure 3 * * claim 6 * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * [I] 5,9,10,12,13 | International search | [A]US2005251033 (SCARANTINO CHARLES W [US], et al); | [A]US2004176672 (SILVER JAMES H [US], et al); | [A]US2006047218 (BLOOM MATTHEW [US], et al); | [A]US2002151816 (RICH COLLIN A [US], et al) | by applicant | US2005149128 | US2006094967 | WO2007136851 |