EP2231621 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING N-SUBSTITUTED HYDROXYPYRIMIDINONE CARBOXAMIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2016/44] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway NJ 07065-0907 / US | ||
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUMPHREY, Guy, R. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
MILLER, Ross, A. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
MALIGRES, Peter, E. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 04 /
WEISSMAN, Steven 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/44] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2010/39] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08869559.8 | 22.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008US87929 | Priority number, date | US20080010421 | 08.01.2008 Original published format: US 10421 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009088729 | Date: | 16.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2231621 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2231621 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/52, C07D413/12 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D239/52 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2010/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN VON N-SUBSTITUIERTEN HYDROXYPYRIMIDINON-CARBOXAMIDEN | [2010/39] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING N-SUBSTITUTED HYDROXYPYRIMIDINONE CARBOXAMIDES | [2010/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'HYDROXYPYRIMIDINONE CARBOXAMIDES N-SUBSTITUÉS | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 07.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.11.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.11.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.03.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 13.03.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.09.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2008 | AT | 02.11.2016 | BE | 02.11.2016 | CY | 02.11.2016 | CZ | 02.11.2016 | DK | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | ES | 02.11.2016 | FI | 02.11.2016 | HR | 02.11.2016 | IT | 02.11.2016 | LT | 02.11.2016 | LV | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | NL | 02.11.2016 | PL | 02.11.2016 | RO | 02.11.2016 | SE | 02.11.2016 | SI | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | TR | 02.11.2016 | IE | 22.12.2016 | LU | 22.12.2016 | MT | 22.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | FR | 02.01.2017 | BG | 02.02.2017 | GB | 02.02.2017 | NO | 02.02.2017 | GR | 03.02.2017 | IS | 02.03.2017 | PT | 02.03.2017 | DE | 01.07.2017 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 22.12.2008 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
TR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IE | 22.12.2016 | ||
LU | 22.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GB | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
DE | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.12.2008 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
IE | 22.12.2016 | ||
LU | 22.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GB | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
DE | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
IE | 22.12.2016 | ||
LU | 22.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
GB | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
DE | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
IE | 22.12.2016 | ||
LU | 22.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
DE | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
IE | 22.12.2016 | ||
LU | 22.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
SE | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 02.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [DY]US2006122205 (BELYK KEVIN M [US], et al) [DY] 1-30 * paragraph [0203] - paragraph [0248]; example 1; claim 45 *; | [DY]WO03035077 (ANGELETTI P IST RICHERCHE BIO [IT], et al) [DY] 1-30 * examples 18,19; claim -; compound 24 *; | [PY] - SUMMA V ET AL, "Discovery of Raltegravir, a Potent, Selective Orally Bioavailable HIV-Integrase Inhibitor for the Treatment of HIV-AIDS Infection", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20080903), vol. 51, no. 18, pages 5843 - 5855, XP002508035 [PY] 1-30 * Schemes 1,2; in particular compound 27; page 5854 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm800245z |