EP2237785 - TRIARYLMETHANE ANALOGS AND THEIR USE IN TREATING CANCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emory University 1599 Clifton Rd. NE 4th Floor, 1599-001-1AZ Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | [2010/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARBISER, Jack, L. 1690 Parliament Pt. Atlanta GA 30329 / US | [2010/41] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Gary, et al HGF Limited Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | [2015/52] |
Former [2013/44] | Wilson, Gary, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Delta House 50 West Nlle Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | ||
Former [2011/20] | Harrison Goddard Foote Delta House 50 West Nlle Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | ||
Former [2010/41] | Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Hope Street Glasgow G2 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08870156.0 | 29.12.2008 | [2010/41] | WO2008US88495 | Priority number, date | US20070009745 | 31.12.2007 Original published format: US 9745 | US20080090027 | 19.08.2008 Original published format: US 90027 | [2010/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009088838 | Date: | 16.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2237785 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2237785 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/55, A61P35/00, A61K31/40, A61P27/00, A61P27/06, A61P27/12, A61P33/02, A61P33/06, A61K31/136, A61K31/14, A61K31/353, A61K31/404, A61K31/422, A61K31/428, A61K31/4706, A61K31/4709, C07D223/26, C07F9/40 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K31/136 (EP,US);
A61K31/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/353 (EP,US);
A61K31/404 (EP,US);
A61K31/422 (EP,US);
A61K31/428 (EP,US);
A61K31/47 (EP,US);
A61K31/4706 (EP,US);
A61K31/4709 (EP,US);
A61K31/54 (EP,US);
A61K31/553 (EP,US);
A61K31/662 (EP,US);
A61K9/127 (US);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D215/26 (EP,US);
C07D215/46 (EP,US);
C07D223/26 (EP,US);
C07D223/28 (EP,US);
C07D263/32 (EP,US);
C07D275/06 (EP,US);
C07D279/28 (EP,US);
C07D311/36 (EP,US);
C07F9/4056 (EP,US);
C07F9/4059 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/47] | A61K31/55, A61P35/00, A61K31/40, A61P27/00, A61P27/06, A61P27/12, A61P33/02, A61P33/06, A61K31/136, A61K31/14, A61K31/353, A61K31/404, A61K31/422, A61K31/428, A61K31/4706, A61K31/4709 | ||
Former IPC [2010/41] | A61K31/55, A61P35/00, A61K31/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/52] |
Former [2010/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TRIARYLMETHAN-ANALOGA UND IHRE VERWENDUNG BEI DER KREBSBEHANDLUNG | [2010/41] | English: | TRIARYLMETHANE ANALOGS AND THEIR USE IN TREATING CANCERS | [2010/41] | French: | ANALOGUES DE TRIARYLMÉTHANE ET UTILISATION DE CES DERNIERS DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE CANCERS | [2010/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 29.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.04.2015 | 01.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.12.2008 | AT | 23.12.2015 | BE | 23.12.2015 | BG | 23.12.2015 | CY | 23.12.2015 | CZ | 23.12.2015 | DK | 23.12.2015 | EE | 23.12.2015 | ES | 23.12.2015 | FI | 23.12.2015 | HR | 23.12.2015 | LT | 23.12.2015 | LV | 23.12.2015 | MC | 23.12.2015 | MT | 23.12.2015 | NL | 23.12.2015 | PL | 23.12.2015 | RO | 23.12.2015 | SE | 23.12.2015 | SI | 23.12.2015 | SK | 23.12.2015 | TR | 23.12.2015 | IE | 29.12.2015 | LU | 29.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | NO | 23.03.2016 | GR | 24.03.2016 | IS | 23.04.2016 | PT | 26.04.2016 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 29.12.2008 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BG | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 29.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 29.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 29.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 29.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 29.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 23.12.2015 | |
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 23.12.2015 | |
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 23.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4170640 (GRIGG GEOFFREY W [AU], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 24; table 2 *; | [X]US2003114403 (MIHAIL ADRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0023] , [0035] , [0039] , [0041]; claim - *; | [XP]WO2008137740 (UNIV EMORY [US], et al) [XP] 1,2* claim - *; | [X] - PERRY BETSY N ET AL, "Pharmacologic blockade of angiopoietin-2 is efficacious against model hemangiomas in mice", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, (200610), vol. 126, no. 10, ISSN 0022-202X, pages 2316 - 2322, XP002661174 [X] 1,2 * page 2318, column l, paragraph l - page 2319, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 2320, column r, paragraph 2 * * figures 5,6,7,8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/SJ.JID.5700413 | International search | [A]US3760007 (STEINMAN M); | [X]US2002123531 (INDIG GUILHERME LUIZ [US], et al); | [X] - INDIG, G. L. ET AL., "Effect of Dye Aggregation on Triarylmethane-Mediated Photoinduced Damage of Hexokinase and DNA", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, B: BIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 67, no. 3, pages 139 - 148, XP009088162 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1011-1344(02)00308-1 | Examination | - DICKERT F L ET AL, "SUBSTITUTED 3 3 DIPHENYLPHTHALIDES AS OPTOCHEMICAL SENSORS FOR POLAR SOLVENT VAPORS", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (1988), vol. 60, no. 14, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 1377 - 1380 |