EP2232222 - PLASTIC HOUSING HAVING INTEGRATED PLUG INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOLTERMANN, Marc Augustenstr. 114 70197 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
HERRMANN, Reinhold Wiener Str. 5 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/39] | Application number, filing date | 08870267.5 | 05.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008EP66860 | Priority number, date | DE20081003848 | 10.01.2008 Original published format: DE102008003848 | [2010/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009087000 | Date: | 16.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2232222 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2232222 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01L19/14, G01P1/02, H05K5/00 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
G01L19/14 (EP,US);
G01L19/0084 (EP,US);
H01R13/504 (EP,US);
H01R13/5202 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4998 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | KUNSTSTOFFGEHÄUSE MIT INTEGRIERTER STECKERSCHNITTSTELLE | [2010/39] | English: | PLASTIC HOUSING HAVING INTEGRATED PLUG INTERFACE | [2010/39] | French: | BOÎTIER EN PLASTIQUE AVEC UNE INTERFACE DE CONNEXION INTÉGRÉE | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 31.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.06.2011 | CZ | 22.06.2011 | DK | 22.06.2011 | EE | 22.06.2011 | FI | 22.06.2011 | HR | 22.06.2011 | HU | 22.06.2011 | IE | 22.06.2011 | IT | 22.06.2011 | LT | 22.06.2011 | LV | 22.06.2011 | MT | 22.06.2011 | NL | 22.06.2011 | PL | 22.06.2011 | RO | 22.06.2011 | SE | 22.06.2011 | SI | 22.06.2011 | SK | 22.06.2011 | TR | 22.06.2011 | BG | 22.09.2011 | NO | 22.09.2011 | GR | 23.09.2011 | ES | 03.10.2011 | IS | 22.10.2011 | PT | 24.10.2011 | LU | 05.12.2011 | BE | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
MT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
TR | 22.06.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
LU | 05.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
MT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
LU | 05.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
MT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
LU | 05.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
MT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
MT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/46] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 22.06.2011 | |
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 22.06.2011 | |
NO | 22.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0187902 (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]) [Y] 1-4,6,7,9 * figure 1 * * page 1, line 1 - line 10 * * page 2, line 19 - line 27 * * page 3, line 5 - page 5, line 2 * * page 5, line 20 - line 22 * * ibidem * [A] 5; | [YX]DE19755497 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-4,7 * figures 1-2c * * column 1, line 1 - line 10 * * column 1, line 36 - line 65 * * column 2, line 39 - line 57 * * column 3, line 2 - line 39 * [X] 8,10; | [YX]JP2006292391 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-4,6,9 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0005] , [0014] , [0017] - [0019] *[X] 8,10 |