EP2230441 - ILLUMINATING DEVICE, DISPLAY DEVICE AND TELEVISION RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Shuki c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
KUROMIZU, Yasumori c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Kaori c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIKAWA, Takahiro c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2010/38] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08871047.0 | 10.12.2008 | [2010/38] | WO2008JP72418 | Priority number, date | JP20080006280 | 15.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008006280 | [2010/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009090811 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2230441 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13357, G02B5/04, // F21S2/00, F21V5/04, G02B3/00, G02B5/02, F21Y103/00 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
G02B5/0231 (EP,US);
G02B5/0278 (EP,US);
G02F1/133604 (EP,US);
G02B3/005 (EP,US);
G02B5/045 (EP,US);
G02F1/133607 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/38] | F21S2/00, F21V5/04, G02B3/00, G02B5/02, G02B5/04, G02F1/13357, F21Y103/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/38] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND FERNSEHEMPFÄNGER | [2010/38] | English: | ILLUMINATING DEVICE, DISPLAY DEVICE AND TELEVISION RECEIVER | [2010/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET RÉCEPTEUR DE TÉLÉVISION | [2010/38] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2010 | Translation filed | 08.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/38] | 29.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | 03.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6100952 (MARVIN BRUCE A [US], et al) [X] 1,4,9-11 * abstract * * column 3, line 21 - line 24 * * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 4; figure 3 * * column 6, line 38 - line 40; figure 5 * [I] 2,3,5-8; | [XI]JP2007265783 (NIPPON ZEON CO) [X] 1,9-11 * paragraph [0047]; figure 8 * [I] 2,3; | [XI]US2007182883 (CHEN CHUNG C [TW], et al) [X] 4,5,7,9-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0036]; figures 2-5 * [I] 6,8; | [XI]EP1790905 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [X] 4-7,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0042] - [0046]; figures 3,4 * [I] 8,11 | International search | [Y]WO2007049515 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2000182418 (KURARAY CO); | [Y]JPH1138207 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003279978 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2007256493 (SONY CORP); | [XP]JP2008251182 (HITACHI MAXELL) | by applicant | JP2006208968 |