EP2285937 - METHODS FOR BREAKING CRUDE OIL AND WATER EMULSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATEL, Nimeshkumar Kantilal Flat F-2 Sharada Enclave 2nd Main Road Malleshpalaya Extension Vignan Nagar Bangalore Karnataka 560 075 / IN | 02 /
SURESH, Seethalakshmi Flat 204 Lohith Paradise Apartments Near Tyco Electronics Hoodi Bangalore Karnataka 560 048 / IN | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Szary, Anne Catherine London Patent Operation GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08871693.1 | 17.12.2008 | [2011/08] | WO2008US87163 | Priority number, date | US20080023211 | 31.01.2008 Original published format: US 23211 | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009097061 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2285937 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C10G29/20, C10G29/22, C10G33/04, C02F1/52, B01D17/04 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
C10G33/04 (EP,US);
B01D17/042 (EP,US);
B01D17/047 (EP,US);
B01D3/00 (EP,US);
C02F1/682 (EP,US);
C10G29/20 (EP,US);
C10G29/22 (EP,US);
C10G31/08 (EP,US);
C02F2101/32 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BRECHEN VON ROHÖL-WASSER-EMULSIONEN | [2011/08] | English: | METHODS FOR BREAKING CRUDE OIL AND WATER EMULSIONS | [2011/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR CASSER DES ÉMULSIONS DE PÉTROLE BRUT ET D'EAU | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 26.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/49] | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 17.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.08.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4321147 (MCCOY DAVID R, et al) [X] 1-26 * example VI *; | [X]US5558768 (IKURA MICHIO [CA], et al) [X] 1-26 * column 3, line 32 - line 34 * * table 1 *; | [A]US5164116 (BERKHOF RUDI [NL], et al) [A] 9,22 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4705834 (BAUR RICHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1,5,6,8,14,18,19 * column 4, line 10 - line 19 *; | [A]US2560333 (DE GROOTE MELVIN, et al) [A] 3-6,16-19 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2007111903 (ENGEL DAVID B [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * paragraph [0040] *; | [A]US3977472 (GRAHAM JOHN W, et al) [A] 1-26 * table 1 *; | [A]US2006135628 (NEWMAN STEVEN P [GB], et al) [A] 1-26 * claims 34-39 *; | [A]US4098692 (BAKER ALAN STUART, et al) [A] 8,21 * column 2, line 55 *; | [A]US4737265 (MERCHANT JR PHILIP [US], et al) [A] 8-21 * column 7, line 7 - line 12 *; | [PX]WO2008020907 (EXXONMOBIL UPSTREAM RES CO [US], et al) [PX] 1,2,12,13 * example 1 * | [A] - P. ALEXANDRIDIS, T.A. HATTON, "Poly(ethylene oxide)-poly(propylene oxide)-poly(ethylene oxide) block copolymer surfactants in aqueous solutions and at interfaces: thermodynamics, structure, dynamics, and modeling", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES A: PHYSICOCHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING ASPECTS, (1995), vol. 96, pages 1 - 46, XP002515653 [A] 1-26 * figure 2; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0927-7757(94)03028-X | [X] - TSUNEHIKO KUWAMURA, HIDEO TAKAHASHI, TOICHIRO HATORI, "Surface Active Block Copolymers: I. The preparation and some surface active properties of block copolymers of tetrahydrofuran and ethylene oxide", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY, (197101), vol. 48, pages 29 - 34, XP002523220 [X] 1-26 * figure 3; table 1 * * page 32 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02673238 |