EP2238793 - SERVING BASE STATION SELECTION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JI, Tingfang 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 02 /
KHANDEKAR, Aamod, D. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 03 /
BHUSHAN, Naga 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 04 /
GOROKHOV, Alexei Y. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 05 /
AGRAWAL, Avneesh 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2010/41] | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | Heselberger, Johannes, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08871948.9 | 23.12.2008 | [2010/41] | WO2008US88256 | Priority number, date | US20080025645P | 01.02.2008 Original published format: US 25645 P | US20080331156 | 09.12.2008 Original published format: US 331156 | [2010/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009097070 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2238793 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/20, H04W36/08 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
H04W36/0085 (EP,US);
H04W36/08 (KR);
H04W36/20 (KR);
H04W48/20 (KR);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/41] | Title | German: | AUSWAHL EINER VERSORGENDEN BASISSTATION IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2010/41] | English: | SERVING BASE STATION SELECTION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2010/41] | French: | SÉLECTION D'UNE STATION DE BASE DE DESSERTE DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2010/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 12.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.03.2013 | 05.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/02] | 22.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5697053 (HANLY STEPHEN VAUGHAN [US]); | [X]US5809430 (D AMICO THOMAS V [US]); | [X]EP0918443 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [X]DE19955838 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]US2002022487 (AHN HEEJUNE [KR]); | [X]WO0230135 (ERICSSON INC [US], et al); | [X]US2004072565 (NOBUKIYO TAKAHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]EP1626607 (NEC CORP [JP]) | Examination | EP0892570 | by applicant | US5809430 | US19450610256 |