EP2222717 - POLYMER AQUEOUS DISPERSION WITH CORE/SKIN STRUCTURE, METHOD FOR MAKING SAME AND APPLICATION THEREOF IN COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema France 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2012/09] |
Former [2011/45] | For all designated states Arkema France 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2010/35] | For all designated states Cray Valley S.A. 16-32, rue Henri Regnault La Défense 6 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOONE, Alain 13 rue des Sablons F-60140 Verderonne / FR | 02 /
NOUGUEREDE, Olivier 24 rue Marx Dormoy F-60340 Saint Leu d'Esserent / FR | 03 /
BETREMIEUX, Isabelle 36 avenue de la Gare F-60580 Coye La Forêt / FR | 04 /
LOZE, Jean-Yves 10 rue Gallois F-60700 Pontpoint / FR | 05 /
ALLORANT, Olivia Prof. Berberich Strasse 14 85079 Neubiberg / DE | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Killis, Andréas, et al ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Killis, Andréas, et al ARKEMA France DP/DRD 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2011/35] | Sauvageot, Olivier Roger, et al Arkema France DPI/DRD 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2010/35] | Killis, Andréas Cray Valley S.A. Service Propriété Industrielle BP 22 60550 Verneuil en Halatte / FR | Application number, filing date | 08871973.7 | 28.11.2008 | [2010/35] | WO2008FR01658 | Priority number, date | FR20070008433 | 30.11.2007 Original published format: FR 0708433 | [2010/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009095569 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2222717 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2222717 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/26, C08F2/00 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
C08F2/26 (EP);
C08F2/001 (EP);
C08F265/06 (EP);
C09D4/00 (EP);
C09D5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/35] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE POLYMERDISPERSION MIT KERN-HÜLLEN-STRUKTUR, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE ANWENDUNG IN BESCHICHTUNGEN | [2010/35] | English: | POLYMER AQUEOUS DISPERSION WITH CORE/SKIN STRUCTURE, METHOD FOR MAKING SAME AND APPLICATION THEREOF IN COATINGS | [2010/35] | French: | DISPERSION AQUEUSE DE POLYMERE STRUCTUREE EN COEUR/ECORCE, SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET SON APPLICATION DANS LES REVETEMENTS | [2010/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 10.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.11.2008 | AT | 29.02.2012 | CY | 29.02.2012 | CZ | 29.02.2012 | EE | 29.02.2012 | FI | 29.02.2012 | HR | 29.02.2012 | IE | 29.02.2012 | LT | 29.02.2012 | LV | 29.02.2012 | MT | 29.02.2012 | RO | 29.02.2012 | SI | 29.02.2012 | SK | 29.02.2012 | TR | 29.02.2012 | BG | 29.05.2012 | GR | 30.05.2012 | IS | 29.06.2012 | PT | 29.06.2012 | LU | 28.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
LU | 28.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 29.02.2012 | |
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 29.02.2012 | |
HR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 29.02.2012 | |
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
IS | 29.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0609756 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [Y] 9,28-30,36 * page 3, lines 35-40 * * claims 6,7 *; | [Y]EP0619342 (MITSUBISHI YUKA BADISCHE [JP]) [Y] 22,28,30 * page 1, lines 1-9 * * page 3, line 57 - page 4, line 10 * * example 1 *; | [DY]WO2004069933 (CRAY VALLEY SA [FR], et al) [DY] 28-32 * page 1, lines 3-8 * * page 6, line 32 - page 7, line 8 ** claim 7 *; | [XY]FR2867478 (CRAY VALLEY SA [FR]) [X] 1-8,10-21,23-27,33-35,37-42 * page 1, lines 1-6 * * page 2, lines 12-24 * * page 3, lines 5-21 * * page 5, line 13 * * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 2 * * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 20 * * page 8, lines 12-19 * * page 8, lines 27-29 * * page 9, line 6 - page 10, line 6 * * page 10, lines 29-34 * [Y] 9,22,28-32,36 |