EP2242308 - RADIO SCHEDULING DEVICE, RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND RADIO SCHEDULING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2010/42] |
Former [2010/42] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INAIDA, Yusuke c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
KIKUMA, Tomohiro c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08872074.3 | 12.12.2008 | [2010/42] | WO2008JP72623 | Priority number, date | JP20080029005 | 08.02.2008 Original published format: JP 2008029005 | [2010/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009098821 | Date: | 13.08.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2242308 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/18, H04W72/08, H04W72/10 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04W72/56 (EP,US);
H04L1/0018 (EP,US);
H04L1/0019 (EP,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W72/542 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/42] | Title | German: | FUNKTERMINPLANUNGSVORRICHTUNG, FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND FUNKTERMINPLANUNGSVERFAHREN | [2010/42] | English: | RADIO SCHEDULING DEVICE, RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND RADIO SCHEDULING METHOD | [2010/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROGRAMMATION RADIO, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION RADIO ET PROCÉDÉ DE PROGRAMMATION RADIO | [2010/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2010 | Translation filed | 08.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 25.11.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2003152630 (NTT DOCOMO INC); | [Y]JP2007274042 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JP2008022135 (FUJITSU LTD) | by applicant | JP2004363679 | JP2007028638 |