EP2258326 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states Uni-charm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAJIMA, Kaiyo c/o Technical Center UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 1531-7, Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | 02 /
MINATO, Hironao c/o Technical Center UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 1531-7, Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Stark, Gordon Drummond Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Stark, Gordon Drummond Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 08873270.6 | 16.12.2008 | [2010/49] | WO2008JP72822 | Priority number, date | JP20080066614 | 14.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008066614 | [2010/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009113219 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2258326 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, A61F5/44, A61F13/49, A61F13/494, A61F13/496 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
A61F13/49017 (EP,US);
A61F13/495 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | SAUGFÄHIGER ARTIKEL | [2010/49] | English: | ABSORBENT ARTICLE | [2010/49] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT | [2010/49] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2010 | Translation filed | 03.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 15.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/01] | 23.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2008065036 (MINATO HIRONAO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-9 * [Y] 3,5 [I] 7; | [Y]US2007239128 (TAKADA NAOKO [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0044]; figure 7 *; | [Y]US2006184151 (ONISHI KAZUAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0033]; figure 1 * | International search | [X]WO2008029923 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2007275298 (UNI CHARM CORP); | [Y]JP2004321460 (UNI CHARM CORP) | by applicant | JP2007105298 |