EP2257449 - FIXTURE HAVING AIRBAG OUTLET FLAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Controls Interiors GmbH & Co. KG Mülhausener Strasse 35 47929 Grefrath / DE | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WITTKAMP, Jürgen Fasanenstrasse 40 41334 Nettetal / DE | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/15] | Schwöbel, Thilo K., et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2010/49] | Schwöbel, Karl T., et al Kutzenberger & Wolff Patentanwaltssozietät Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 08873449.6 | 19.12.2008 | [2010/49] | WO2008EP10967 | Priority number, date | DE20081015044 | 19.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008015044 | [2010/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009115112 | Date: | 24.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2257449 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2257449 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/2165, B60R21/16, B60R21/215 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
B60R21/2165 (EP,US);
B60R2021/161 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/49] | B60R21/215 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | AUSSTATTUNGSTEIL MIT AIRBAGAUSTRITTSKLAPPE | [2010/49] | English: | FIXTURE HAVING AIRBAG OUTLET FLAP | [2010/49] | French: | PIÈCE D'ÉQUIPEMENT AVEC VOLET DE SORTIE DE COUSSIN GONFLABLE | [2010/49] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 13.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2008 | CY | 09.04.2014 | CZ | 09.04.2014 | DK | 09.04.2014 | EE | 09.04.2014 | ES | 09.04.2014 | FI | 09.04.2014 | HR | 09.04.2014 | IT | 09.04.2014 | LT | 09.04.2014 | LV | 09.04.2014 | MC | 09.04.2014 | MT | 09.04.2014 | NL | 09.04.2014 | PL | 09.04.2014 | RO | 09.04.2014 | SE | 09.04.2014 | SI | 09.04.2014 | SK | 09.04.2014 | TR | 09.04.2014 | BG | 09.07.2014 | NO | 09.07.2014 | GR | 10.07.2014 | IS | 09.08.2014 | PT | 11.08.2014 | AT | 19.12.2014 | IE | 19.12.2014 | LU | 19.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.12.2008 | |
CY | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
TR | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
AT | 19.12.2014 | ||
IE | 19.12.2014 | ||
LU | 19.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CY | 09.04.2014 | |
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
AT | 19.12.2014 | ||
IE | 19.12.2014 | ||
LU | 19.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
AT | 19.12.2014 | ||
IE | 19.12.2014 | ||
LU | 19.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
AT | 19.12.2014 | ||
IE | 19.12.2014 | ||
LU | 19.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
IE | 19.12.2014 | ||
LU | 19.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
IE | 19.12.2014 | ||
LU | 19.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 19.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 19.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 09.04.2014 | |
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | DK | 09.04.2014 | |
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | ES | 09.04.2014 | |
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | ES | 09.04.2014 | |
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 09.04.2014 | |
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 09.04.2014 | |
BG | 09.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB2421225 (VISTEON GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * page 1, lines 5-9 * * page 1, lines 20-24 * * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 28 * * page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 7 * * page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 2 * * figures 1,3-7 * [I] 4; | [XI]WO2006057632 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] * * paragraphs [0014] , [0016] , [0019] , [0020] * * paragraphs [0022] , [0024] , [0027] - [0031] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 2; | [XI]DE19958865 (PEGUFORM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 3, lines 38-45 * * column 1, line 52 - column 4, line 52 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 3,6; | [XA]US5306042 (FRANK FREDERICK W [US]) [X] 1,5 * column 1, lines 1-16 * * column 1, lines 45-57 * * column 2, lines 28-52 * * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 48 * * figure - * [A] 4; | [PX]DE102007005922 (DRAEXLMAIER LISA GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1,2,4-6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0009] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0034] * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE3835581 | DE4234988 | JP2002200954 | GB2421225 |