EP2236231 - GUN DRILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITAC, Incorporated 23-21, Minamimukonoso 3-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0033 / JP | [2010/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOMURA, Takuji c/o UNITAC Incorporated 23-21 Minamimukonoso 3-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661-0033 / JP | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08873650.9 | 18.11.2008 | [2010/40] | WO2008JP70907 | Priority number, date | JP20080077207 | 25.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008077207 | [2010/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009118947 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2236231 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/06, B23B51/00, B23B51/04 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
B23B51/0486 (EP,US);
B23B2251/46 (EP,US);
B23B51/066 (EP,US);
Y10T408/03 (EP,US);
Y10T408/455 (EP,US);
Y10T408/558 (EP,US);
Y10T408/895 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/40] | B23B51/06, B23B51/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/40] | Title | German: | KANONENBOHRER | [2010/40] | English: | GUN DRILL | [2010/40] | French: | FORET À CANON | [2010/40] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2010 | Translation filed | 19.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 23.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2000326123 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1,3 * figures 1,8,9 * * the whole document * [Y] 4-6 [I] 2; | [Y]US4616964 (NOMURA TAKUJI [JP]) [Y] 4,6 * figures 1-10 * * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 5 *; | [Y]JPS5969207 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP) [Y] 5 * figure 3 * * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2000326123 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [Y]JP2003236713 (YUNITAKKU KK); | [Y]JPS5969207 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP); | [Y]JPS6080808U (TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO., LTD.); | [Y]JP2005007512 (YUNITAKKU KK); | [Y]JPS5834706 (NIPPON YAKIN KK); | [A]JPS60183109U (DIJET INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.); | [A]JPS5676308U (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP.) | by applicant | JP2004130413 | JP2003025129 | JP2003236713 |