EP2223260 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR REAL-TIME FORECASTING AND PREDICTING OF ELECTRICAL PEAKS AND MANAGING THE ENERGY, HEALTH, RELIABILITY, AND PERFORMANCE OF ELECTRICAL POWER SYSTEMS BASED ON AN ARTIFICIAL ADAPTIVE NEURAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EDSA Micro Corporation 16870 West Bernardo Court Suite 330 San Diego, CA 92127 / US | [2010/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NASLE, Adib 13640 Ash Hollow Crossing Poway, CA 92064 / US | 02 /
NASLE, Ali 12324 Kingsgate Square San Diego, CA 92128 / US | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08874194.7 | 07.11.2008 | [2010/35] | WO2008IB03921 | Priority number, date | US20070986139P | 07.11.2007 Original published format: US 986139 P | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009136230 | Date: | 12.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2223260 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06G7/00 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
G05B13/026 (EP,US);
G06N3/08 (US);
G05B13/027 (EP,US);
G05B15/02 (EP,US);
G05B19/0428 (US);
G06F30/13 (EP,US);
G06F30/20 (EP,US);
G06N3/10 (US);
G06N5/048 (US);
G06N7/06 (US);
G05B2219/2639 (US);
G06F2111/02 (EP,US);
G06F2119/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/35] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ECHTZEIT-PROGNOSE UND -VORHERSAGE ELEKTRISCHER SPITZEN UND ZUR VERWALTUNG DER ENERGIE, GESUNDHEIT, ZUVERLÄSSIGKEIT UND LEISTUNG ELEKTRISCHER STROMVERSORGUNGSSYSTEME AUF GRUNDLAGE EINES KÜNSTLICHEN ADAPTIVEN NEURONALEN NETZWERKS | [2010/35] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR REAL-TIME FORECASTING AND PREDICTING OF ELECTRICAL PEAKS AND MANAGING THE ENERGY, HEALTH, RELIABILITY, AND PERFORMANCE OF ELECTRICAL POWER SYSTEMS BASED ON AN ARTIFICIAL ADAPTIVE NEURAL NETWORK | [2010/35] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR UNE PRÉVISION ET UNE PRÉDICTION EN TEMPS RÉEL DE PICS ÉLECTRIQUES ET UNE GESTION DE L'ÉNERGIE, DE LA SANTÉ, DE LA FIABILITÉ ET DE LA PERFORMANCE DE SYSTÈMES D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE SUR LA BASE D'UN RÉSEAU NEURONAL ADAPTATIF ARTIFICIEL | [2010/35] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 10.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.05.2013 | 30.11.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2003234218 (YANG IK-BAE [KR]); | [Y]US2007239373 (NASLE ADIB [US]) |