EP2351056 - BARRIER ARRANGEMENT FOR A CABLE DUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRITSCHE, Ronny Dr. Carlo-Schmid-Str. 168 90491 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
HEINZIG, Peter Kreuzwiesstrasse 11 8735 Gallenkappel / CH | 03 /
HOPPE, Jens Flurstrasse 29 90592 Schwarzenbruck / DE | 04 /
JAHNEL, Dietmar Schopenhauerstrasse 11 53842 Troisdorf / DE | 05 /
SCHLAGER, Johann Flachsröststrasse 58b 90475 Nürnberg / DE | [2019/52] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
FRITSCHE, Ronny Dr. Carlo-Schmid-Strasse 168 90491 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02 /
HEINZIG, Peter Kreuzwiesstrasse 11 90530 Wendelsteinch_8735 Gallenkappel / CH | |||
03 /
HOPPE, Jens Flurstrasse 29 90592 Schwarzenbruck / DE | |||
04 /
JAHNEL, Dietmar Schopenhauerstrasse 11 53842 Troisdorf / DE | |||
05 /
SCHLAGER, Johann Flachsröststrasse 58b 90475 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08875066.6 | 28.11.2008 | [2011/31] | WO2008EP10285 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010060450 | Date: | 03.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2351056 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2351056 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/04 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
H01F27/04 (EP);
H01F27/363 (EP,US);
H01B17/26 (EP);
H01F27/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/52] |
Former [2011/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BARRIERENANORDNUNG FÜR EINE LEITUNGSDURCHFÜHRUNG | [2011/31] | English: | BARRIER ARRANGEMENT FOR A CABLE DUCT | [2011/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BARRIÈRES POUR PASSAGE POUR CÂBLES | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 13.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.11.2008 | CY | 25.12.2019 | CZ | 25.12.2019 | DK | 25.12.2019 | EE | 25.12.2019 | ES | 25.12.2019 | FI | 25.12.2019 | HR | 25.12.2019 | IT | 25.12.2019 | LT | 25.12.2019 | LV | 25.12.2019 | MC | 25.12.2019 | MT | 25.12.2019 | NL | 25.12.2019 | PL | 25.12.2019 | RO | 25.12.2019 | SI | 25.12.2019 | SK | 25.12.2019 | TR | 25.12.2019 | BG | 25.03.2020 | NO | 25.03.2020 | GR | 26.03.2020 | IS | 25.04.2020 | PT | 20.05.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
TR | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 25.12.2019 | |
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 25.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE1282170 (LICENTIA GMBH) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 7 - line 44 * * column 3, line 19 - line 36; figure 1 * [Y] 5-13; | [A]EP0285895 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 21 - line 42 ** column 3, line 55 - column 6, line 3; figure . *; | [YD]DE102005021255 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [YD] 5-13 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026]; figure 1 * |