EP2359203 - A METHOD FOR PROVIDING CONTROL AND AUTOMATION SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/34] | A SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR PROVIDING CONTROL AND AUTOMATION SERVICES | ||
[2015/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [2011/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNDARAM, Senthil, Kumar H-503, Akme Ballet Doddanekundi KR Puram Bangalore-560037 / IT | 02 /
SANKARAN, Sunderam 11 H Rajaji Road Salem Tamil Nadu Bangalore 560037 / IN | 03 /
VENKATESWARAN, Narayanan 421 First Cross Church Road New Thippasandra Bangalore 5600075 / IN | 04 /
GUTERMUTH, Georg Kaiserstr. 1 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2015/44] |
Former [2011/34] | 01 /
SUNDARAM, Senthil, Kumar H-503, Akme Ballet Doddanekundi KR Puram Bangalore-560037 / IT | ||
02 /
SANKARAN, Sunderam 11 H Rajaji Road Salem Tamil Nadu Bangalore 560037 / IN | |||
03 /
VENKATESWARAN, Narayanan 421 First Cross Church Road New Thippasandra Bangalore 5600075 / IN | |||
04 /
GUTERMUTH, Georg Kaiserstr. 1 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2015/44] |
Former [2011/34] | Leidescher, Thomas Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstraße 15 DE-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08875758.8 | 24.11.2008 | [2011/34] | WO2008IB03268 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010058241 | Date: | 27.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2359203 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2359203 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
G05B19/4185 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US);
Y02P90/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/44] |
Former [2011/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON STEUER- UND AUTOMATISIERUNGSDIENSTEN | [2015/19] | English: | A METHOD FOR PROVIDING CONTROL AND AUTOMATION SERVICES | [2015/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR ASSURER DES SERVICES DE COMMANDE ET D'AUTOMATISATION | [2015/19] |
Former [2011/34] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON STEUER- UND AUTOMATISIERUNGSDIENSTEN | ||
Former [2011/34] | A SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR PROVIDING CONTROL AND AUTOMATION SERVICES | ||
Former [2011/34] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ASSURER DES SERVICES DE COMMANDE ET D'AUTOMATISATION | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 01.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.10.2014 | 17.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.11.2008 | AT | 28.10.2015 | BE | 28.10.2015 | BG | 28.10.2015 | CY | 28.10.2015 | CZ | 28.10.2015 | DK | 28.10.2015 | EE | 28.10.2015 | ES | 28.10.2015 | FI | 28.10.2015 | HR | 28.10.2015 | IT | 28.10.2015 | LT | 28.10.2015 | LV | 28.10.2015 | MC | 28.10.2015 | MT | 28.10.2015 | NL | 28.10.2015 | PL | 28.10.2015 | RO | 28.10.2015 | SE | 28.10.2015 | SI | 28.10.2015 | SK | 28.10.2015 | TR | 28.10.2015 | IE | 24.11.2015 | LU | 24.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | FR | 28.12.2015 | NO | 28.01.2016 | GR | 29.01.2016 | IS | 28.02.2016 | PT | 29.02.2016 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 24.11.2008 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
BG | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
TR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IE | 24.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
FR | 28.12.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
IE | 24.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
FR | 28.12.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
IE | 24.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
FR | 28.12.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
IE | 24.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
IE | 24.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
LT | 28.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0165422 (CADENCE DESIGN SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 3 * * page 28, line 30 - page 38, line 30; figures 8-10 *; | [X]WO0195100 (EMWARE INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 12 * * page 6, line 17 - line 19 ** page 9, line 7 - line 20; figure 1 *; | [X]WO03007092 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 4 - line 6; figure 1 * * page 7, line 10 - page 8, line 27 * * page 3, line 13 - page 6, line 4; figure 9a * * page 26, line 4 - page 28, line 20 *; | [X]WO2004027608 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 8, line 30 - page 9, line 25 *; | [X]EP1416400 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0046] - [0050] - [0063] - [0066]; figure 1; claim 1 * | by applicant | WO0165422 | WO0195100 | WO03007092 | WO2004027608 | EP1416400 |