EP2308188 - IDENTIFICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zebra Technologies Corporation 3 Overlook Point Lincolnshire, IL 60069 / US | [2019/16] |
Former [2011/15] | For all designated states ZIH Corp. Astwood Dickinson Building 83-85 Front Street, 2nd Floor Hamilton HM 12 / BM | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURNER, Christopher, Gordon, Gervase 53 Brill Road Oakley HP 18 9QN / GB | 02 /
PRETORIUS, Albertus, Jacobus 225 Irene Glen 0157 Kunwini / ZA | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/18] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2011/15] | Rees, Simon John Lewis Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol, Avon BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08876518.5 | 22.12.2008 | [2011/15] | WO2008US87895 | Priority number, date | US20080173646 | 15.07.2008 Original published format: US 173646 | [2011/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010008413 | Date: | 21.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2308188 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2308188 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, G06K7/00 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
G06K7/0008 (EP,US);
G06K7/10019 (US);
H04L1/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2022/18] |
Former [2011/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | IDENTIFIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2011/15] | English: | IDENTIFICATION SYSTEM | [2011/15] | French: | SYSTÈME D'IDENTIFICATION | [2011/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 29.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 18.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 18.01.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.03.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2008 | CY | 04.05.2022 | EE | 04.05.2022 | HR | 04.05.2022 | LT | 04.05.2022 | LV | 04.05.2022 | MC | 04.05.2022 | MT | 04.05.2022 | RO | 04.05.2022 | SI | 04.05.2022 | SK | 04.05.2022 | TR | 04.05.2022 | BG | 04.08.2022 | IS | 04.09.2022 | PT | 05.09.2022 | LU | 22.12.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 22.12.2008 | |
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
TR | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 22.12.2008 | |
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 22.12.2008 | |
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | EE | 04.05.2022 | |
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | EE | 04.05.2022 | |
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | EE | 04.05.2022 | |
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | HR | 04.05.2022 | |
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | HR | 04.05.2022 | |
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | LT | 04.05.2022 | |
PT | 05.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO9943113 (NEW ID INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5,9,11,13,15 * page 36, line 5 - page 37, line 14 * * figures 15A,15B * [Y] 4 [I] 2,6,10,12,14,16; | [Y]EP1060454 (TROLLEY SCAN PROPRIETARY LTD [ZA]) [Y] 7-8 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0062] ** figure 4 *; | [Y]EP1363470 (INFOTECH SOFTWARE LTD [FR]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0057] *; | [IY]US2006279412 (HOLLAND JOSHUA H [US], et al) [I] 1-5,9-20 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0051] * * claims 33-41 * * figures 5,7 * [Y] 7-8 |