EP2338119 - POWER AND PERFORMANCE MANAGEMENT USING MAIDX AND ADAPTIVE DATA PLACEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LSI Corporation 1621 Barber Lane MS D-106 Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCKEAN, Brian 1693 Brown Court Longmont CO 80503 / US | 02 /
ZWISLER, Ross 732 Gateway Circle Lafayette CO 80026 / US | [2011/26] | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 08877459.1 | 20.11.2008 | [2011/26] | WO2008US12969 | Priority number, date | US20080288037 | 16.10.2008 Original published format: US 288037 | [2011/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010044766 | Date: | 22.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2338119 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
G06F3/0647 (EP,US);
G06F12/02 (KR);
G06F3/06 (KR);
G06F3/0611 (EP,US);
G06F3/0625 (EP,US);
G06F3/0689 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGS- UND LEISTUNGSFÄHIGKEITSVERWALTUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MAIDX UND ADAPTIVER DATENPLATZIERUNG | [2011/26] | English: | POWER AND PERFORMANCE MANAGEMENT USING MAIDX AND ADAPTIVE DATA PLACEMENT | [2011/26] | French: | GESTION DE LE CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE ET DE LA PERFORMANCE EN UTILISANT UN MAIDX ET UN PLACEMENT DE DONNÉES ADAPTATIF | [2011/26] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 22.09.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006069886 (TULYANI AKHIL [US]); | [Y]US2004187131 (DAGEVILLE BENOIT [US], et al); | [A]US6895485 (DEKONING RODNEY A [US], et al); | [A]US2003149837 (COKER KENNY T [US], et al); | [A]US6314503 (D ERRICO MATTHEW J [US], et al); | [A]US5796633 (BURGESS GREGORY M [US], et al) |