EP2373509 - RAMP FOR EVACUATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bombardier Transportation GmbH Schöneberger Ufer 1 10785 Berlin / DE | [2011/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARBONNEAU, Mathieu 5365 Drolet, 101 Montreal, Québec H2T 2H5 / CA | 02 /
LECLERC, Olivier 2420 Place Neptune, 3 Brossard, Québec J4Y 1R4 / CA | 03 /
LANDRY, Jean-Bernard 7881 Madeleine Huguenin, 1 Montreal, Québec H1L 6M6 / CA | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2011/41] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 08878829.4 | 18.12.2008 | WO2008CA02220 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010069032 | Date: | 24.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2373509 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2373509 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 24.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60J9/00, B61D19/00, B62D63/04, E06B7/16, B60P1/43, B64D25/08, B61D19/02, B60J5/04 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
B60J5/108 (EP,US);
B60J5/0497 (EP,US);
B60P1/43 (EP,US);
B61D19/023 (EP,US);
B64D25/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/41] | B60J9/00, B61D19/00, B62D63/04, E06B7/16, B60P1/43, B64D25/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAMPE FÜR EINE EVAKUIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2011/41] | English: | RAMP FOR EVACUATION DEVICE | [2011/41] | French: | RAMPE DESTINÉE À UN DISPOSITIF D'ÉVACUATION | [2011/41] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 31.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2008 | BE | 20.11.2013 | BG | 20.11.2013 | CY | 20.11.2013 | DK | 20.11.2013 | EE | 20.11.2013 | FI | 20.11.2013 | HR | 20.11.2013 | LT | 20.11.2013 | LV | 20.11.2013 | MC | 20.11.2013 | MT | 20.11.2013 | NL | 20.11.2013 | RO | 20.11.2013 | SE | 20.11.2013 | SI | 20.11.2013 | SK | 20.11.2013 | TR | 20.11.2013 | IE | 18.12.2013 | LU | 18.12.2013 | NO | 20.02.2014 | GR | 21.02.2014 | IS | 20.03.2014 | PT | 20.03.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 18.12.2008 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
MT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
TR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | HU | 18.12.2008 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
TR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 18.12.2008 | |
BE | 20.11.2013 | ||
BG | 20.11.2013 | ||
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
TR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | BE | 20.11.2013 | |
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
TR | 20.11.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | BE | 20.11.2013 | |
CY | 20.11.2013 | ||
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | BE | 20.11.2013 | |
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
MC | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | BE | 20.11.2013 | |
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SI | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 20.11.2013 | |
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
IE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | BE | 20.11.2013 | |
DK | 20.11.2013 | ||
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | BE | 20.11.2013 | |
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
RO | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
SK | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | BE | 20.11.2013 | |
EE | 20.11.2013 | ||
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | BE | 20.11.2013 | |
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
PT | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | BE | 20.11.2013 | |
FI | 20.11.2013 | ||
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
LV | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
HR | 20.11.2013 | ||
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 20.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 20.11.2013 | |
LT | 20.11.2013 | ||
NL | 20.11.2013 | ||
SE | 20.11.2013 | ||
NO | 20.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 20.11.2013 | |
NO | 20.02.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0776808 (FINE PRODUCTS S A [ES]) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 34 - column 9, line 36 * * figures 5,7 *; | [A]EP1149750 (EUROMOTIVE GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-12 * abstract ** figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1686032 (BARAT [FR]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0011] - [0027] * * figures 1,3,4 * | International search | [X]US3449864 (PROST-DAME CLAUDE, et al); | [A]US3745707 (HERR T); | [A]US6179545 (PETERSEN JR LEE B [US], et al); | [A]US6343908 (OUDSTEN JAN DEN [CA], et al); | [A]EP1686032 (BARAT [FR]) |