EP2377047 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SPARQL-QUERY PROCESSING USING PARAMETRIZED-SPARQL-QUERY IN DBMS-BASED SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Institute Of Science And Technology Information 52 Eoeun-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon-si 305-333 / KR | [2011/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jae Han 166-7 Nusang-dong Jongno-gu Seoul 110-041 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Seung Woo 119-1001 Malgeun Achim Apt. Nae-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-981 / KR | 03 /
SUNG, Won Kyung 207-704 EXPO Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Dong In 101-503 Kumho Bestvill Jamwon-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-907 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Pyung 204-1304 Yangji maeul Banseok-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-150 / KR | 06 /
JUNG, Han Min 129-305 Hanbit Apt. 99 Eoeun-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-755 / KR | 07 /
HAHN, Sun Hwa 109-1601 Chonggu Narae Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-729 / KR | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | Naylor, Matthew John Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Naylor, Matthew John Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08878942.5 | 17.12.2008 | WO2008KR07472 | Priority number, date | KR20080127507 | 15.12.2008 Original published format: KR 20080127507 | [2011/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010071244 | Date: | 24.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2377047 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
G06F16/2452 (EP,US);
G06F17/40 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SPARQL-ABFRAGEVERARBEITUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER PARAMETRISIERTEN SPARQL-ABFRAGE IN SYSTEMEN AUF DBMS-BASIS | [2011/42] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SPARQL-QUERY PROCESSING USING PARAMETRIZED-SPARQL-QUERY IN DBMS-BASED SYSTEMS | [2011/42] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INTERROGATIONS SPARQL UTILISANT UNE INTERROGATION SPARQL PARAMÉTRÉE DANS DES SYSTÈMES BASÉS SUR DBMS | [2011/42] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 15.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 04.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/49] | 16.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - ANDREA BONOMI ET AL, A System Supporting Users of Cultural Resource Management Semantic Portals, AI*IA 2007: ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE AND HUMAN-ORIENTED COMPUTING; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 757 - 764, (20070910), ISBN 978-3-540-74781-9, XP019099686 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * * page 761, paragraph 2 * * page 763, paragraph 2 - page 764, paragraph 1; figure 4 * | [Y] - Cristian Pérez De Laborda ET AL, "RDQuery - Querying Relational Databases on-the-fly with RDF-QL", Poster and Demo Proceedings of the 15th International Conference on Knowledge Engineering and Knowledge Management, EKAW 2006, Podebrady, Czech Republic, 2nd-6th October, 2006, (20061001), URL: http://dbs.cs.uni-duesseldorf.de/publikationen/2006/PerZloCon06.pdf, (20121023), XP055041931 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * * page 1, column r, paragraph 1 - page 2, column l, paragraph 4 * | [A] - BIJAN PARSIA ED - PEDRO BARAHONA ET AL, Querying the Web with SPARQL, REASONING WEB LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 53 - 67, (20060101), ISBN 978-3-540-38409-0, XP019039641 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US40308 (RANGANATHAN, ANAND ET AL.); | [A]WO2008026794 (KOREA INST SCI & TECH INF [KR], et al); | [A]KR20080071213 (KOREA INST SCI & TECH INF [KR]) |