EP2379170 - IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE FOR MONITORING SYNCHRONICITY OF THE VENTRICLES OF A HEART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/43] | IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MONITORING SYNCHRONICITY OF THE VENTRICLES OF A HEART | ||
[2014/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2015 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states St. Jude Medical AB 175 84 Järfälla / SE | [2011/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÄRVERUD, Karin Ballonggatan 17 S-169 71 Solna / SE | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | Sjölander, Henrik, et al Aros Patent AB P.O. Box 1544 751 45 Uppsala / SE | [2014/42] |
Former [2012/33] | Sjölander, Henrik, et al Aros Patent AB P.O. Box 1544 751 45 Uppsala / SE | ||
Former [2011/43] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 08879223.9 | 22.12.2008 | WO2008SE00742 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010074611 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2379170 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2379170 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/365, // A61B5/053 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
A61N1/3622 (EP,US);
A61B5/053 (EP,US);
A61B5/7239 (EP,US);
A61N1/36521 (EP,US);
A61N1/36585 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/43] | A61N1/365, A61B5/053 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER SYNCHRONIZITÄT DER HERZKAMMERN | [2014/27] | English: | IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE FOR MONITORING SYNCHRONICITY OF THE VENTRICLES OF A HEART | [2014/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL IMPLANTABLE DE SURVEILLANCE DE LA SYNCHRONICITÉ DES VENTRICULES D'UN COEUR | [2014/27] |
Former [2011/43] | IMPLANTIERBARE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER SYNCHRONIZITÄT DER HERZKAMMERN | ||
Former [2011/43] | IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MONITORING SYNCHRONICITY OF THE VENTRICLES OF A HEART | ||
Former [2011/43] | DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL IMPLANTABLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE DE LA SYNCHRONICITÉ DES VENTRICULES D'UN C UR | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 24.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2008 | AT | 15.10.2014 | BG | 15.10.2014 | CY | 15.10.2014 | CZ | 15.10.2014 | DK | 15.10.2014 | EE | 15.10.2014 | ES | 15.10.2014 | FI | 15.10.2014 | HR | 15.10.2014 | LT | 15.10.2014 | LV | 15.10.2014 | MC | 15.10.2014 | MT | 15.10.2014 | NL | 15.10.2014 | PL | 15.10.2014 | RO | 15.10.2014 | SE | 15.10.2014 | SI | 15.10.2014 | SK | 15.10.2014 | TR | 15.10.2014 | IE | 22.12.2014 | LU | 22.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | GB | 15.01.2015 | NO | 15.01.2015 | GR | 16.01.2015 | IS | 15.02.2015 | PT | 16.02.2015 | [2017/51] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 22.12.2008 | |
AT | 15.10.2014 | ||
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
TR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.12.2008 | |
AT | 15.10.2014 | ||
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
TR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/48] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 15.10.2014 | |
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 15.10.2014 | |
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 15.10.2014 | |
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 15.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007191901 (SCHECTER STUART O [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0084] , [0111] , [0115] , [0121] , [0143]; figures 1,2,5-12,20,21,23, * [I] 4-13; | [A]WO2007064259 (ST JUDE MEDICAL [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9930777 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004050177 (BIOTRONIK GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2008262361 (GUTFINGER DAN E [US], et al); | [AD]US7082329 (JAERVERUD KARIN [SE]); | [AD]US7190996 (JAERVERUD KARIN [SE]); | [A]WO0200296 (ST JUDE MEDICAL [SE], et al); | [A]US2005182447 (SCHECTER STUART O [US]); | [A]US2007191901 (SCHECTER STUART O [US]); | [A]US2007293770 (BOUR FRANK [FR], et al); | [A]US2008234773 (NI QUAN [US], et al); | [A]US2008082134 (LANG VOLKER [US]) | [A] - JARVERUD K. ET AL, "Analysis of the O-wave in acute right ventricular apex impedance measurements with a standard pacing lead in animals", MEDICAL & BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING & COMPUTING, (200209), vol. 40, no. 5, pages 512 - 519, XP001186043 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02345448 |