EP2380015 - NON-DESTRUCTIVE INSPECTION METHOD WITH OBJECTIVE EVALUATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation 6900 Main Street P.O. Box 9729 Stratford, CT 06615-9129 / US | [2011/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, John T. 179 Cleveland Avenue Bridgeport, Connecticut 06606 / US | 02 /
URSENBACH, Dan 19414 130th St. E Bonney Lake, WA 98391 / US | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/43] | 01 /
WONG, John T. 179 Cleveland Avenue Bridgeport, Connecticut 06606 / US | ||
02 /
URSENBACH, Dan 874 Hill Street Hamden, Connecticut 06514 / US | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | Klunker, Hans-Friedrich Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08879313.8 | 30.12.2008 | WO2008US88509 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010077240 | Date: | 08.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2380015 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/44, G06F9/44 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
G01N29/265 (EP,US);
G01N29/4427 (EP,US);
G01N29/4445 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0231 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0234 (EP,US);
G01N2291/2694 (EP,US);
G01N33/2045 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NICHTDESTRUKTIVES INSPEKTIONSVERFAHREN MIT OBJEKTIVER BEWERTUNG | [2011/43] | English: | NON-DESTRUCTIVE INSPECTION METHOD WITH OBJECTIVE EVALUATION | [2011/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INSPECTION NON DESTRUCTIVE AVEC UNE ÉVALUATION OBJECTIVE | [2011/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 06.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2006287836 (MATEO MARTINEZ ANTONIO M [ES]) [X] 14 * the whole document * [A] 5-7 [I] 1-4,8-13,15; | [XAI]WO0206814 (LOCKHEED CORP [US]) [X] 14 * the whole document * [A] 5-7,9,10 [I] 1-4,8,11-13,15; | [A] - PRAKASH R ET AL, "Ultrasonic determination of lay-up order in cross-plied cfrp", COMPOSITES,, (19770401), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 100 - 102, XP001331031 [A] 5-7 * the whole document * | [A] - HSU D K ET AL, "Ultrasonically mapping the ply layup of composite laminates", MATERIALS EVALUATION : ME, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR NONDESTRUCTIVE TESTING, US, (20020901), vol. 60, no. 9, ISSN 0025-5327, pages 1099 - 1106, XP009129273 [A] 5-7 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4487072 (LIVINGSTON WAYLON A [US]); | [Y]US5591913 (TUCKER JAMES R [US]); | [A]US5777891 (PAGANO DOMINICK [US], et al); | [X]US5824908 (SCHINDEL DAVID W [CA], et al) |