EP2172539 - Microorganism capable of producing gamma-L-PGA, method for production of Gamma-L-PGA using the microorganism, crosslinked product, and agent for external application to the skin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-8, Dojima Hama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8230 / JP | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Shuhei Toyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha 10-24, Toyo-cho Tsuruga-shi Fukui 914-0047 / JP | 02 /
Kitagawa, Masaru Toyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha 10-24, Toyo-cho Tsuruga-shi Fukui 914-0047 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Michiko Toyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0292 / JP | 04 /
Sogabe, Atsushi Toyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-8, Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8230 / JP | 05 /
Ashiuchi, Makoto National University Corporation Kochi University Faculty of Agriculture 200 Monobe Nankoku-shi Kochi 783-8502 / JP | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09000100.9 | 12.03.2007 | [2010/14] | Priority number, date | JP20060142685 | 23.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006142685 | JP20060305894 | 10.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006305894 | JP20060305897 | 10.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006305897 | [2010/14] | Previously filed application, date | WO2007JP54864 | 12.03.2007 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2172539 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, A61K8/88, A61K38/00, A61P17/16, A61Q19/00, C08G69/10, C12P13/14 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/88 (EP,US);
A61P17/16 (EP);
C08G69/10 (EP,US);
C08L77/04 (EP,US);
C12P21/02 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L77/04, C08L2666/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/14] | Title | German: | Mikroorganismus, der gamma-L-PGA produzieren kann, Verfahren zur Produktion von gamma-L-PGA unter Verwendung des Mikroorganismus, vernetztes Produkt und Mittel zur äußeren Anwendung auf die Haut | [2010/14] | English: | Microorganism capable of producing gamma-L-PGA, method for production of Gamma-L-PGA using the microorganism, crosslinked product, and agent for external application to the skin | [2010/14] | French: | Micro-organisme capable de produire du gamma-L-PGA, procédé de fabrication de gamma-L-PGA en utilisant le micro-organisme, produit réticulé et agent pour une application externe sur la peau | [2010/14] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 27.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 29.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/44] | 04.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07738336.2 / EP2019133 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070738336) is 12.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2003105081 (KEIO GIJUKU, et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2004007593 (BIOLEADERS CORP [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1557152 (IDEMITSU TECHNOFINE CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]CN1667019 (UNIV SHANGHAI [CN]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - CHOI H J ET AL, "Preparation conditions and swelling equilibria of hydrogel prepared by gamma-irradiation from microbial poly(gamma-glutamic acid)", RADIATION PHYSICS AND CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950801), vol. 46, no. 2, ISSN 0969-806X, pages 175 - 179, XP004051387 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0969-806X(95)00009-M | [Y] - KUNIOKA M, "Biosynthesis and chemical reactions of poly(amino acid)s from microorganisms", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 47, no. 5, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 469 - 475, XP002564809 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002530050958 | [PY] - MURAKAMI SAEKO ET AL, "Bio-based hydrogels prepared by cross-linking of microbial poly(gamma-glutamic acid) with various saccharides", BIOMACROMOLECULES, (200607), vol. 7, no. 7, ISSN 1525-7797, pages 2122 - 2127, XP002564810 [PY] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bm0600264 | [Y] - YANG Z ET AL, "Poly(glutamic acid) poly(ethylene glycol) hydrogels prepared by photoinduced polymerization: Synthesis, characterization, and preliminary release studies of protein drugs", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH, WILEY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20021001), vol. 62, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9304, pages 14 - 21, XP002306399 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - ASHIUCHI ET AL, "Enzymatic synthesis of high-molecular-mass poly-gamma-glutamate and regulation of its stereochemistry", 20040101; 20040000, (20040101), vol. 70, pages 4249 - 4255, XP002339209 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - PARK ET AL, "Synthesis of super-high-molecular-weight poly-gamma-glutamic acid by Bacillus subtilis subsp. chungkookjang", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS. B, ENZYMATIC, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20050901), vol. 35, no. 4-6, ISSN 1381-1177, pages 128 - 133, XP005027019 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcatb.2005.06.007 |