EP2105628 - Brace disc, in particular ceramic brake disc, for motor vehicles and device for showing the wear on brake discs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosenlöcher, Jens Siebentischstrasse 15 86161 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
Waninger, Robert Am Güssgraben 1 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [2009/40] | Representative(s) | Asch, Konrad AUDI AG Patentabteilung I/EZ-1 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Asch, Konrad AUDI AG Patentabteilung I/EZ-1 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 09000188.4 | 09.01.2009 | [2009/40] | Priority number, date | DE20081015602 | 26.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008015602 | [2009/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2105628 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2105628 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/12, F16D66/02 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
F16D65/126 (EP);
F16D66/02 (EP);
F16D2066/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/22] |
Former [2009/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bremsscheibe, insbesondere Keramik-Bremsscheibe, für Kraftfahrzeuge, sowie Vorrichtung zur Verschleissanzeige an Bremsscheiben | [2009/40] | English: | Brace disc, in particular ceramic brake disc, for motor vehicles and device for showing the wear on brake discs | [2009/40] | French: | Disque de frein, notamment disque de frein en céramique, pour véhicules automobiles et dispositif d'affichage de l'usure sur des disques de frein | [2009/40] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 31.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE10116659 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * paragraph [0020]; figure - *; | [A]US4604604 (MANN JOSEPH M [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2002117360 (TOBY DENNIS E [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [XA]EP1248009 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [X] 16 * the whole document * [A] 1 | by applicant | DE10116659 |