EP2057967 - A filter device for capturing embolic material in a blood vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB | [2009/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsugita, Ross S. 1653 Gretel Lane Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 02 /
Maahs, Tracy D. 1610 Nantucket Circle 213 Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 03 /
Jang, Yue-Teh 43659 Skye Road Fremont, CA 94539 / US | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/20] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09000226.2 | 01.05.1998 | [2009/20] | Priority number, date | US19970852867 | 08.05.1997 Original published format: US 852867 | [2009/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2057967 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2057967 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/01 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
A61F2/013 (EP,US);
A61F2/0105 (EP,US);
A61F2/0108 (EP,US);
A61F2/011 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2212 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320716 (EP,US);
A61F2/014 (EP,US);
A61F2/82 (EP,US);
A61F2/95 (EP,US);
A61F2002/018 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0006 (EP,US);
A61F2230/005 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0067 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0071 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0076 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2009/20] | Title | German: | Filtervorrichtung zum Einfangen von Emboliematerial in einem Blutgefäß | [2009/20] | English: | A filter device for capturing embolic material in a blood vessel | [2009/20] | French: | Dispositif de filtre pour capturer un matériau embolique dans un vaisseau sanguin | [2009/20] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 09.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03079083.6 / EP1400257 | EP98918917.0 / EP0980278 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980918917) is 31.01.2003 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.01.2013 | BE | 09.01.2013 | CY | 09.01.2013 | DK | 09.01.2013 | FI | 09.01.2013 | MC | 09.01.2013 | NL | 09.01.2013 | SE | 09.01.2013 | GR | 10.04.2013 | ES | 20.04.2013 | LU | 01.05.2013 | PT | 09.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/08] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
BE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 09.01.2013 | |
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 09.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9601591 (MICROVENA CORP [US]) [A] 1-12* figures 12a,12b *; | [PX]WO9717100 (EMBOL X INC [US]) [PX] 1-12 * figure 4 *; | [E]EP1226796 (ANGIOGUARD INC [US]) [E] 1-12 * figure 9 * | by applicant | US4733665 | US4795458 | US5037427 | US5089005 | US5466242 | WO9633677 | US5769816 | US5846260 | US5989281 | - BARBUT ET AL., "Cerebral Emboli Detected During Bypass Surgery Are Associated With Clamp Removal", STROKE, (1994), vol. 25, no. 12, pages 2398 - 2402 | US19950553137 | US19950580223 | US19960584759 | US19960645762 |