EP2088162 - Method for manufacturing polymer dispersions, dispersions created thereby and their application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celanese Emulsions GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 111 61476 Kronberg/Ts. / DE | [2009/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Harmin, Dr Im Birkenfeld 2 65719 Hofheim / DE | 02 /
Petri, Harald Heidestrasse 42 65326 Aarbergen / DE | 03 /
Drechsel, Thomas Stettiner Strasse 3 61440 Steinbach/Ts / DE | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Ackermann, Joachim Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Ackermann Postfach 11 13 26 60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Ackermann, Joachim Postfach 11 13 26 60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 09000243.7 | 09.01.2009 | [2009/33] | Priority number, date | DE20081008421 | 09.02.2008 Original published format: DE102008008421 | [2009/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2088162 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2088162 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/24 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
C08F2/24 (EP,KR,US);
C08F18/08 (EP);
C08F2/22 (KR);
C08F20/10 (KR);
C08F218/08 (EP);
C08J3/02 (KR);
C09D131/04 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F18/08, C08F2/24 (EP);
C08F218/08, C08F210/02, C08F220/325 (EP);
C09D131/04, C08L29/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polymerdispersionen, die damit erhaltenen Dispersionen und deren Verwendung | [2009/33] | English: | Method for manufacturing polymer dispersions, dispersions created thereby and their application | [2009/33] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de dispersions polymères, dispersions obtenues à l'aide de celles-ci et leur utilisation | [2009/33] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.05.2012
ADMISSIBLE Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE Opponent's representative Schuderer, Michael, et al, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.05.2012
ADMISSIBLE Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE Opponent's representative Schuderer, Michael, et al, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | 03.07.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.11.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.10.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.10.2013 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 07.11.2013 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.01.2009 | CY | 24.08.2011 | CZ | 24.08.2011 | DK | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | FI | 24.08.2011 | HR | 24.08.2011 | IE | 24.08.2011 | LT | 24.08.2011 | LV | 24.08.2011 | MK | 24.08.2011 | MT | 24.08.2011 | PL | 24.08.2011 | RO | 24.08.2011 | SI | 24.08.2011 | SK | 24.08.2011 | TR | 24.08.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | NO | 24.11.2011 | GR | 25.11.2011 | IS | 24.12.2011 | PT | 26.12.2011 | LU | 09.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
LU | 09.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NO | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10335958 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-8,10-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0013] , [0015] - [0019] - [0022] - [0025] - [0035] , [0045] - [0047] - [0049] *; | [X]DE102005054904 (WACKER POLYMER SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,5-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0010] , [0011] , [0015] - [0020] - [0023] , [0027] , [0030] , [0035] * * claims 7-9 *; | [X]DE102006019184 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0039] - [0043] - [0047] - [0050] - [0053] , [0054] , [0059] , [0060] , [0064] , [0070] , [0071] *; | [X]DE102006020275 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5-12* paragraphs [0001] , [0011] , [0028] , [0033] , [0038] - [0040] - [0046] , [0047] , [0051] , [0072] , [0080] * | by applicant | EP0486262 | JPH0782304 | WO2004022609 | WO2004096871 | EP1491558 | WO2004113392 | WO2005000916 | WO2005016977 | DE10335958 | DE102005054904 | - P.H.H. ARAÜJO, DECHEMA MONOGRAPHS, (2001), vol. 137, pages 653 - 9 | - "Makromolekulare Stoffe", HOUBEN-WEYL, Methoden der organischen Chemie, GEORG-THIEME-VERLAG, (1961), vol. XIV, pages 411 - 420 |