EP2042227 - EMISSION TREATMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD USING A SCR FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/14] | Emission treatment system and method using a scr filter | ||
[2015/26] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Revocation of patent | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Corporation 100 Campus Drive Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | [2011/01] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states BASF Catalysts LLC 100 Campus Drive Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | ||
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states ENGELHARD CORPORATION 101 Wood Avenue, P.O. Box 770 Iselin, NJ 08830-0770 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patchett, Joseph, Allan 46 Queen Anne Drive Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | 02 /
Dettling, Joseph Charles 8 Spicey Pond Road Howell, NJ 07731 / US | 03 /
Przybylski, Elizabeth, Alina 188 Evergreen Road. 4B Edison, NJ 08837 / US | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2009/14] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09000346.8 | 30.07.2004 | [2009/14] | Priority number, date | US20030634659 | 05.08.2003 Original published format: US 634659 | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2042227 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2042227 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2042227 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, F01N3/20, B01J35/04, B01J37/02, F01N3/28, B01J29/76, F01N3/10, F01N3/023, F01N13/00 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
B01J29/7615 (EP,US);
B01D53/94 (KR);
B01D19/0005 (EP,US);
B01D19/0036 (EP,US);
B01D5/0054 (EP,US);
B01D5/009 (EP,US);
B01D53/9413 (US);
B01D53/9418 (EP,US);
B01D53/945 (US);
B01D53/9477 (EP,US);
B01J29/76 (US);
B01J35/56 (US);
B01J35/657 (US);
B01J37/0236 (US);
B01J37/024 (US);
B01J37/0246 (EP,US);
B01J37/08 (US);
F01N13/009 (EP,US);
F01N3/0231 (EP,US);
F01N3/10 (US);
F01N3/106 (EP,US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
F01N3/2828 (US);
F01N3/2892 (US);
B01D2251/2062 (EP,US);
B01D2251/2067 (EP,US);
B01D2255/102 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20715 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20738 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20761 (EP,US);
B01D2255/50 (US);
B01D2255/502 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9155 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9202 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9205 (EP,US);
B01D2257/404 (US);
B01D2258/012 (EP,US);
B01D53/944 (EP,US);
F01N2330/06 (US);
F01N2330/30 (US);
F01N2370/04 (EP,US);
F01N2510/063 (EP,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
F01N2610/08 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/14] | B01D53/94, F01N3/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/31] |
Former [2009/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EMISSIONSBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN VERWENDEND EINEN SCR-FILTER | [2015/26] | English: | EMISSION TREATMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD USING A SCR FILTER | [2015/26] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'ÉMISSIONS UTILISANT UN FILTRE A RÉDUCTION CATALYTIQUE SÉLECTIVE (SCR) | [2015/26] |
Former [2009/14] | Emissionsbehandlungssystem und einen SCR-Filter verwendendes Verfahren | ||
Former [2009/14] | Emission treatment system and method using a scr filter | ||
Former [2009/14] | Système de traitement d'émissions et procède d'utilisation d'un filtre a réduction catalytique sélective (SCR) | Examination procedure | 24.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 16.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 21.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2013 | Observations by third parties | 05.06.2013 | Observations by third parties | 19.09.2014 | Observations by third parties | 10.04.2015 | Observations by third parties | 23.04.2015 | Observations by third parties | 24.04.2015 | Observations by third parties | 06.05.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.05.2015 | 07.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.05.2015 | Observations by third parties | 02.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04779814.5 / EP1663458 | Divisional application(s) | EP15161517.6 / EP2933009 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040779814) is 04.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.07.2015
12.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company 5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | 02
04.03.2016
31.08.2016
WITHDRAWN Umicore AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.07.2015
12.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company 5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
02
04.03.2016
31.08.2016
WITHDRAWN Umicore AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.07.2015
12.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company 5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
02
04.03.2016
16.03.2016
ADMISSIBLE Umicore AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
Former [2015/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company 5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | 09.06.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.12.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 17.12.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/08] | Appeal following opposition | 08.01.2018 | Appeal received No. T0056/18 | 27.04.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.12.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 17.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.04.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 02.04.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.04.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2004 | AT | 29.07.2015 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | DK | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | RO | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | IE | 30.07.2015 | LU | 30.07.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 30.07.2004 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 30.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 30.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 30.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
GR | 30.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0393917 (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [X] 5-7 * page 1, lines 1-3,43-53 * * page 3, lines 1-3 * * page 4, lines 50-53 * * table 2 * * claims 1,4 *; | [A]JPH03130522 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-4,10* abstract *; | [X]EP0800856 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 8,9,11 * page 2, lines 3-6,49-51 * * example B1 * * claims 1,7 *; | [X]US2003044520 (KIESSLING RALPH [DE], et al) [X] 12,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0009] , [0012] , [0023] , [0042] , [0043] , [0060] * * figures 4,5 * * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP1298112 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0012] * * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO03054364 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-4,10 * page 5, line 25 - page 7, line 11 * * page 11, line 29 - page 12, line 23 * * page 14, line 14 - page 15, line 11 * * figure 1 * * claims 1,4,14,16,31,32,56,62-66 * | Examination | - S. HASHIMOTO, Y. MIYAIRI, T. HAMANAKA, R. MATSUBARA, T. HARADA, S. MIWA, "SiC and Cordierite Diesel Particulate Filters Designed for Low Pressure Drop and Catalyzed, Uncatalyzed Systems", SAE TECHNICAL PAPER SERIES, Warrendale, PA, USA, (20020304), no. 2002-01-0322, ISSN 0148-7191, pages 1 - 14 | by applicant | US4329162 | US4912776 | US4961917 | US4963332 | JPH03130522 | US5100632 | US5462907 | US5491120 | US5516497 | US5522218 | WO9939809 | WO0112320 | US6415602 | - "Durability Driving Schedule for Light Duty Vehicles and Light Duty Trucks", CODE OF FEDERAL REGULATIONS, vol. 86, pages 836 - 01 | other | WO03054364 | US7229597 | US7902107 | - BAERLOCHER C.H., ATLAS OF ZEOLITE FRAMEWORK TYPES, (2001), pages 1 - 2, 4, 7, 22, XP003032355 | - HECK R. M. ET AL, "Reduction of No.", CATALYTIC AIR POLLUTION CONTROL COMMERCIAL TECHNOLOGY. SECOND EDITION., (20090101), vol. 2, pages 310 - 315, XP003032356 | Opposition | - KASAI et al., "New Cordierite Diesel Particulate Filter Material for the Diesel Particulate - NOx Reduction System", SAE Technical Paper 2004-01-09 53 | - PEREDA-AYO et al., "Influence of the washcoat characteristics on NH3-SCR behaviour of Cu- zeolite monoliths", Catalysis Today, (20130000), vol. 216, pages 82 - 89, XP028707215 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cattod.2013.06.012 | - "Experiments to show how the viscosity of copper zeolite SCR catalyst composition affects the resulting back pressure", Annex 1 - Rheology Modifier Study | - Annex 2 - Letter of response dated 18 April 2016 filed on behalf of BASF Corporation on European patent application, EP 2933009 A1 . |