EP2213812 - Panelling, in particular floor panelling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flooring Technologies Ltd. Portico Building Marina Street Pieta MSD 08 / MT | [2010/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3c 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 09001179.2 | 28.01.2009 | [2010/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2213812 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2213812 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02, F16B5/00 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
E04F15/02 (EP,US);
F16B5/0056 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0138 (EP,US);
Y10T428/167 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | Paneel, insbesondere Bodenpaneel | [2010/31] | English: | Panelling, in particular floor panelling | [2010/31] | French: | Panneau, en particulier panneau de sol | [2010/31] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 06.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2009 | CY | 07.03.2012 | CZ | 07.03.2012 | DK | 07.03.2012 | EE | 07.03.2012 | FI | 07.03.2012 | GR | 07.03.2012 | HR | 07.03.2012 | LT | 07.03.2012 | LV | 07.03.2012 | MK | 07.03.2012 | MT | 07.03.2012 | RO | 07.03.2012 | SI | 07.03.2012 | BG | 07.06.2012 | NO | 07.06.2012 | IS | 07.07.2012 | PT | 09.07.2012 | [2015/38] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 28.01.2009 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MK | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MK | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 07.03.2012 | |
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
NO | 07.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2498666 (KLEINFELDEN JEAN [FR]) [A] 1-4,7* figures 2,4 *; | [Y]DE19823357 (LEHMANN GUENTER [DE]) [Y] 1-3,7,8 * figures 1,2,5 *; | [Y]DE20008708U (KRONOSPAN TECH CO LTD [CY]) [Y] 1-3,7,8 * page 3, paragraph 6; figures 1,2,5 * * claim 1 *; | [A]DE102005002297 (HAMBERGER INDUSTRIEWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 4 *; | [X]DE102007020271 (HIPPER AUGUST [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * figures 1-3,10-13 *; | [X]WO2008116623 (KRONOTEC AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,7 * figures 2,3,5,8 * | by applicant | DE20008708U | DE10224540 | WO2008116623 | DE102007015048 |