EP2053700 - Electrical terminal socket assembly for vehicular component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEES Inc. 830 Crescent Centre Drive, Suite 600 Franklin, TN 37067 / US | [2011/26] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Alcoa Fujikura Ltd. 830 Crescent Centre Drive, Suite 600 Franklin, TN 37067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhao, Weiping Fairlane Business Park 999 Republic Drive Allen Park, MI 48101 / US | 02 /
Mikkola, Duane I. Fairlane Business Park 999 Republic drive Allen Park, MI 48101 / US | [2013/02] |
Former [2009/18] | 01 /
Zhao, Weiping Fairlane Business Park, 999 Republic Drive Allen Park MI 48101 / US | ||
02 /
Mikkola, Duane I. Fairlane Business Park 999 Republic drive Allen Park MI 48101 / US | Representative(s) | Barton, Matthew Thomas, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Barton, Matthew Thomas, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/02] | Barton, Matthew Thomas, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/18] | Galloway, Peter David, et al LADAS & PARRY LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09001335.0 | 14.09.2001 | [2009/18] | Priority number, date | US20000232698P | 15.09.2000 Original published format: US 232698 P | US20010271776P | 27.02.2001 Original published format: US 271776 P | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2053700 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2053700 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/187 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
H01R11/22 (EP,US);
H01R13/187 (EP,KR,US);
H01R4/184 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49195 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2009/18] | Title | German: | Elektrische Anschlussbuchsenanordnung für Fahrzeuge | [2009/18] | English: | Electrical terminal socket assembly for vehicular component | [2009/18] | French: | Douille de contact électrique pour véhicule | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 23.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/44] | 28.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01970860.1 / EP1319262 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010970860) is 14.06.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4720157 (NESTOR CHARLES R [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 15 - line 25 * * column 3, line 51 - line 53 * * column 4, line 11 - line 17 * * figures 2-4,7,8 *[Y] 2,11; | [Y]US4750897 (NEIDECKER RUDOLF [CH]) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 48; figure 2 *; | [X]US5921822 (KENNEDY ROBERT D [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * figures 3,4,7 *; | [Y]DE19833675 (INTERCONNECTRON GMBH [DE]) [Y] 11 * column 4, line 23 - line 24 * | by applicant | US4657335 | US4734063 |