EP2113334 - Processing centre with rotatable and pivotable workpiece table with a clamp device for the pivoting axle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Berthold Hermle AG Industriestrasse 8-12 78559 Gosheim / DE | [2009/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernhard, Franz-Xaver Böttinger Strasse 5 78549 Spaichingen / DE | 02 /
Schwörer, Tobias, Dipl.-Ing (FH) Egesheimer Strasse 14 78598 Königsheim / DE | [2011/15] |
Former [2009/45] | 01 /
Bernhard, Franz-Xaver Böttinger Strasse 5 78549 Spaichingen / DE | ||
02 /
Schwörer, Thobias, Dipl.-Ing (FH) Egesheimer Strasse 14 78598 Königsheim / DE | Representative(s) | Hager, Thomas Johannes Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Hager, Thomas Johannes Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09002363.1 | 19.02.2009 | [2009/45] | Priority number, date | DE20081021416 | 29.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008021416 | [2009/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2113334 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2113334 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/28, B23Q1/54, B23Q11/00 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
B23Q1/5406 (EP,US);
B23Q1/28 (EP,US);
B23Q11/0092 (EP,US);
Y10T409/305824 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2010/27] |
Former [2009/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bearbeitungszentrum mit dreh- und schwenkbarem Werkstücktisch mit einer Klemmeinrichtung für die Schwenkachse | [2009/45] | English: | Processing centre with rotatable and pivotable workpiece table with a clamp device for the pivoting axle | [2009/45] | French: | Centre de traitement doté d'une table de pièce à usiner rotative et pivotante dotée d'un dispositif de serrage pour l'axe pivotant | [2009/45] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/45] | 14.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6332604 (CHU CHIH-YAUNG [TW]) [A] 1-14* column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 48; figures 1-3 *; | [DYA]EP1262275 (HERMLE BERTHOLD MASCHF AG [DE]) [DY] 1,2,4-9,12,13 * abstract * [A] 3,10,11,14; | [Y]DE20121653U (SCHWAEBISCHE WERKZEUGMASCHINEN [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4-9,12,13 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP1262275 |