EP2060269 - Modulation of immunostimulatory properties by small oligonucleotide-based compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYBRIDON, INC. 345 Vassar Street Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2009/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Agrawal, Sudhir 61 Lamplighter Drive Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | 02 /
Zhu, Fu-Gang 10 Buttonwood Street, Apt. 2 Dorchester, MA 02125 / US | 03 /
Kandimalla, Ekambar, R. 6 Candlewood Lane Southboro, MA 01772 / US | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Müller, Christian Stefan Gerd, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | Müller, Christian Stefan Gerd, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09002658.4 | 24.05.2004 | [2009/21] | Priority number, date | US20030528277P | 08.12.2003 Original published format: US 528277 P | [2009/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2060269 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2060269 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/39 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
C12N15/117 (EP,US);
A61K39/39 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07H21/00 (KR);
A61K2039/55561 (EP,US);
C12N2310/17 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
C12N2310/318 (EP,US);
C12N2310/3183 (EP,US);
C12N2310/32 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Title | German: | Modulation der immunstimulatorischen Eigenschaften mittels kleiner oligonukleotidbasierter Verbindungen | [2009/21] | English: | Modulation of immunostimulatory properties by small oligonucleotide-based compounds | [2009/21] | French: | Modulation des propriétés immunostimulatrices par des petits composés à base d'oligonucléotides | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 19.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/14] | 25.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04820710.4 / EP1699814 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03057822 (HYBRIDON INC [US]) [X] 1-6,12 * The whole document, in particular p11, li.9-17, p31, li.19-23, p6, li.9-11 and; page 6, line 19 - line 24 *; | [A]US6218371 (KRIEG ARTHUR M [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [PA]EP1393745 (HYBRIDON INC [US]) [PA] * The whole document, in particular; paragraphs [0013] , [0015] , [0047] , [0086] , [0103]; sequence 30 * | [A] - KANDIMALLA EKAMBAR R ET AL, "Divergent synthetic nucleotide motif recognition pattern: design and development of potent immunomodulatory oligodeoxyribonucleotide agents with distinct cytokine induction profiles.", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20030501), vol. 31, no. 9, ISSN 1362-4962, pages 2393 - 2400, XP002989074 [A] * The whole document in particular, the; page 2398, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkg343 | [A] - BHAGAT L ET AL, "CpG penta- and hexdeoxyribonucleotides as potent immunomodulatory agents", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20030101), vol. 300, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 853 - 861, XP002989072 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(02)02943-1 | by applicant | US5149798 | US5635377 | US5366878 | US5652355 | US6683167 | US6346614 | US6143881 | WO9849288 | WO0112804 | WO0155370 | WO0183503 | WO0226757 | US5912332 | - "Protocols for Oligonucleotides andAnalogs", Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (1993), vol. 20, pages 165 - 189 | - Oligonucleotides and Analogues, A Practical Approach, (1991), pages 87 - 108 | - AGRAWAL; IYER, CURR. OP. IN BIOTECH., (1995), vol. 6, page 12 | - KHORANA ET AL., J. MOLEC. BIOL., (1972), vol. 72, page 209 | - REESE, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1978), vol. 34, pages 3143 - 3179 | - BEAUCAGE; CARUTHERS, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1981), vol. 22, pages 1859 - 1862 | - AGRAWAL; GOODCHILD, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1987), vol. 28, pages 3539 - 3542 | - CONNOLLY ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 23, page 3443 | - JAGER ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1988), vol. 27, page 7237 | - AGRAWAL ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD SCI. (USA), (1988), vol. 85, pages 7079 - 7083 | - CPG. KURAMOTO ET AL., JPN. J. CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 83, pages 1128 - 1131 | - KRIEG ET AL., NATURE, (1995), vol. 371, pages 546 - 549 | - LIANG ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1996), vol. 98, pages 1119 - 1129 | - MOLDOVEANU ET AL., VACCINE, (1998), vol. 16, pages 1216 - 124 | - MCCLUSKIE; DAVIS, J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 161, pages 4463 - 4466 | - ZHAO ET AL., BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (1996), vol. 51, pages 173 - 182 | - ZHAO ET AL., BIOCHEM PHARMACOL., (1996), vol. 52, pages 1537 - 1544 | - ZHAO ET AL., ANTISENSE NUCLEIC ACID DRUG DEV., (1997), vol. 7, pages 495 - 502 | - ZHAO ET AL., BIOORG. MED CHEM LETT., (1999), vol. 9, pages 3453 - 3458 | - ZHAO ET AL., BIOORG. MED CHEM. LETT., (2000), vol. 10, pages 1051 - 1054 | - YU ET AL., BIOORG. MED CHEM, LETT, (2000), vol. 10, pages 2585 - 2588 | - YU ET AL., BIOORG. MED CHEM LETT., (2001), vol. 11, pages 2263 - 2267 | - KANDIMALLA ET AL., BIOORG. MED CHEM., (2001), vol. 9, pages 807 - 813 | - NORONHA ET AL., BIOCHEM., (2000), vol. 39, pages 7050 - 7062 | - ZHAO ET AL., BIOCHEM PHARMA, (1996), vol. 51, pages 173 - 182 |