EP2105355 - Crashbox [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH Residenzstrasse 1 33104 Paderborn / DE | [2009/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Handing, Christian, Dr. Königsallee 33 33449 Langenberg / DE | 02 /
Dörr, Jochen, Dr. Ulmenweg 7 33014 Bad Driburg / DE | [2009/40] | Representative(s) | Griepenstroh, Jörg Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Griepenstroh, Jörg Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | ||
Former [2009/40] | Griepenstroh, Jörg Patentanwälte Bockermann, Ksoll Griepenstroh, Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 09002796.2 | 27.02.2009 | [2009/40] | Priority number, date | DE20081015891 | 26.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008015891 | [2009/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2105355 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2105355 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2105355 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/34 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
B60R19/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2010/36] |
Former [2009/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Crashbox | [2009/40] | English: | Crashbox | [2009/40] | French: | Crashbox | [2009/40] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 07.07.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.08.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE9310036U (SUSPA COMPART AG [DE]) [Y] 1-6,18,19 * page 1, line 24 - page 6, line 4; figure -; claim - *[A] 17; | [DYA]DE29907513U (SUSPA COMPART AG [DE]) [DY] 1-16,18,19 * page 2, line 9 - page 8, line 25; figure -; claim - * [A] 17; | [DYA]DE102004036929 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [DY] 1-16,18,19 * paragraphs [0004] - [0033]; figure -; claim - * * paragraph [0033] * [A] 17; | [L]EP2105354 (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [L] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4028164 | DE9310036U | DE19537206 | DE19537205 | DE29907513U | DE10014469 | DE4345550 | DE102004036929 |